Christman v. Consolidated Rail Corporation
Plaintiff: Ross Christman
Defendant: Consolidated Rail Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00135
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DEATH as to Ross R. Christman by Ross Christman. (Russo, Teresa) Modified on 5/12/2021 to update document title (shk).
May 7, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa M Russo on behalf of Ross Christman (Russo, Teresa)
May 5, 2021 Filing 32 TELEPHONIC HEARING (scheduled as a Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference) held on 5/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Teresa Russo. Dft appeared by atty Patrick Horvat. Atty Russo advises Pla is deceased. Atty Russo anticipates filing an amended complaint naming Pla's spouse as the Pla once an estate has been opened. Court stays case. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/7/2021 at 10:30 am. Court to initiate call. Parties are to file an amended discovery plan. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
May 4, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Russo, Teresa)
May 4, 2021 Filing 30 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Russo, Teresa)
May 3, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Jackson PHV on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation (Jackson PHV, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M Horvat PHV on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation (Horvat PHV, Patrick)
April 29, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M Horvat PHV on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation (Horvat PHV, Patrick) ***FILING ERROR; ATTORNEY REFILED AT #28 *** Modified on 5/3/2021 (ace).
April 29, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Jackson PHV on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation (Jackson PHV, Jeffrey) ***FILING ERROR; ATTORNEY REFILED AT #29 *** Modified on 5/4/2021 (ace).
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey A Jackson PHV for Consolidated Rail Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 4/29/2021. (ace)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick M Horvat PHV for Consolidated Rail Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 4/29/2021. (ace)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #21 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is granted in part. The appearance of atty Daniel J. Mohan is hereby withdrawn on behalf of Dft Conrail. The request to withdraw the appearance of Laura S. Platt is denied. Atty Platt is to file a separate motion to withdraw pursuant to Local Rule 83-8(c). Text entry order.(mr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 22 Application for Attorney Patrick Horvat to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4556531(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Daley Mohan Groble, P.C. by Defendant Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Mohan, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 Application for Attorney Jeffrey Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4551154(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry L Loftus on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation (Loftus, Barry)
April 19, 2021 Filing 18 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
April 19, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2021 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
April 8, 2021 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01876. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 30, 2021 Case Electronically Transmitted to the Northern District of Indiana on 3/30/2021. (amb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/30/2021. #14 Stipulation to transfer case APPROVED; case TRANSFERRED to Northern District of Indiana. #5 Defendant's motion to transfer or dismiss for lack of jurisdiction DENIED as moot. #13 Plaintiff's motion to file surreply DENIED as moot. (cc: all counsel)(cb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION Parties' Proposed Agreed Transfer Order by Ross Christman. (Russo, Teresa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by Ross Christman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Monroe, Stephen) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Consolidated Rail Corporation re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Platt, Laura) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 EXHIBIT G to #10 Response to Motion filed by Ross Christman. s>RESPONSE to Motion filed by Ross Christman re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Transfer Case . (Monroe, Stephen) Modified on 2/24/2021 (amb). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
February 18, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #10 Response to Motion, filed by Ross Christman ; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Ross Christman re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J)(Monroe, Stephen) Modified on 2/24/2021 (amb). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Consolidated Rail Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mohan, Daniel) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ross Christman. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Russo, Teresa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
January 29, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to all parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (amb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa M Russo on behalf of Ross Christman. Attorney(s) appearing: Teresa Russo (Russo, Teresa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by Consolidated Rail Corporation re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Platt, Laura) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Transfer Case by Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Platt, Laura) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura S Platt on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Laura S. Platt (Platt, Laura) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Mohan on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel J. Mohan (Mohan, Daniel) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Ross Christman (Monroe, Stephen) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
December 18, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Ross Christman. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3675311) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Monroe, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet- Milwaukee Division per Atty) (cmb). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christman v. Consolidated Rail Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Rail Corporation
Represented By: Laura S Platt
Represented By: Daniel J Mohan
Represented By: Barry L Loftus
Represented By: Jeffrey A Jackson PHV
Represented By: Patrick M Horvat PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Christman
Represented By: Stephen Monroe
Represented By: Teresa M Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?