Brewbaker et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Patrick S. Brewbaker and Sandra J. Brewbaker
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00144
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick S. Brewbaker, Sandra J. Brewbaker. Department of VA and US Attorney General served on 4/26/2021; United States of America AUSA served on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (Forbes, Randal)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
April 16, 2021 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Randal S Forbes on behalf of Patrick S. Brewbaker, Sandra J. Brewbaker (Forbes, Randal)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages against United States of America( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4543744.), filed by Patrick S. Brewbaker, Sandra J. Brewbaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A VA FTCA 95 Claim, #2 Exhibit B FTCA Acknowledgement, #3 Exhibit C VA FTCA Right to Sue Letter 10/15/2020, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Forbes, Randal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewbaker et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick S. Brewbaker
Represented By: Randal S Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Brewbaker
Represented By: Randal S Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?