Hinton v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Darrie Hinton
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00145
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: US Department of Veterans Affairs served on 4/23/2021; US Attorney General served on 4/29/2021; and US Attorney's Office served on 4/22/2021; answer due 6/21/2021, per #4 . (lhc)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrie Hinton. All Defendants. (Farnbauch, David)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (rmc)
April 20, 2021 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Farnbauch on behalf of Darrie Hinton (Farnbauch, David)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages in a Civil Case against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4544648.), filed by Darrie Hinton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Farnbauch, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinton v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrie Hinton
Represented By: David L Farnbauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?