Bradley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sarah Louise Bradley
Defendant: Andrew M Saul and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00182
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Sarah Louise Bradley. Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/21/2021; U.S. Attorney General served on 5/21/2021; and U.S. Attorney served on 5/21/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (bas)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2020-27. (bas)
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 6/11/2021. (mr)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS) (lhc)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING payment of the filing fee; and DIRECTING, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/17/2021. (cc: USMS) (lhc)
May 13, 2021 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE, IFP MOTION PENDING) (jld)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl E Osterhout on behalf of Sarah Louise Bradley (Osterhout, Karl)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sarah Louise Bradley. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms)(Osterhout, Karl)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul, filed by Sarah Louise Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to U.S. Attorney, #3 Proposed Summons To OGC, #4 Proposed Summons to Attorney General)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Louise Bradley
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?