Everett Cash Mutual Insurance Company v. Gree USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Everett Cash Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Gree USA Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., MJC America Holdings Co., Inc., MJC America Ltd, Gree Electric Appliances Inc of Zhuhai and MJC America Ltd doing business as Soleus International Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00254
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #5 Order, Set Deadlines Jurisdictional Statement filed by Everett Cash Mutual Insurance Company. (Ross, Michael)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is AFFORDED to and including 7/20/2021, to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement that adequately articulates each party's citizenship. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 7/6/2021. (lhc)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gree Electric Appliances Inc of Zhuhai, Gree USA Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., MJC America Holdings Co., Inc., MJC America Ltd. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
July 2, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (mlc)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Everett Cash Mutual Insurance Company. (Ross, Michael)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C Ross on behalf of Everett Cash Mutual Insurance Company (Ross, Michael)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4617483.), filed by Everett Cash Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons -Gree USA, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons -Gree Zhuhai (USA), #4 Proposed Summons -Gree Zhuhai (China), #5 Proposed Summons -Gree Hong Kong (USA), #6 Proposed Summons -Gree Hong Kong (Hong Kong), #7 Proposed Summons -MJC America Ltd d/b/a Soleus Int'l Inc., #8 Proposed Summons -MJC America Holdings Co., Inc.)(Ross, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everett Cash Mutual Insurance Company v. Gree USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Holdings Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances Inc of Zhuhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Ltd doing business as Soleus International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett Cash Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?