Foster v. KBP Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leland Foster
Defendant: KBP Investments, LLC and Shain Melanie
Case Number: 1:2021cv00260
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #7 Dft KBP Investments, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time is granted. Dft KBP Investments, LLC is granted to and including 9/8/2021 file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Text entry order.(mr)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin S Borozan on behalf of KBP Investments, LLC (Borozan, Kevin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant KBP Investments, LLC. (Smigielski, Mary)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary A Smigielski on behalf of KBP Investments, LLC (Smigielski, Mary)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leland Foster. KBP Investments, LLC served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Dunn, Owen)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leland Foster. Shain Melanie served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Dunn, Owen)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KBP Investments, LLC, Shain Melanie. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
July 8, 2021 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmf)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons filed by Leland Foster. (Dunn, Owen)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KBP Investments, LLC, Shain Melanie( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4621792.), filed by Leland Foster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons KBP investments LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Shain Melanie)(Dunn, Owen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. KBP Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland Foster
Represented By: Owen B Dunn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBP Investments, LLC
Represented By: Kevin S Borozan
Represented By: Mary A Smigielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shain Melanie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?