Markley v. Civil Town of et al
Plaintiff: Raymond D Markley, I and Raymond D Markley, Jr
Defendant: Van Buren Civil Town of, Michelle Sexton, Dale Osborn and Donny Powell
Case Number: 1:2021cv00305
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE by Dale Osborn, Donny Powell, Michelle Sexton re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #18 Memorandum in Support to Pro Se Litigant (Keen, Robert)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dale Osborn, Donny Powell, Michelle Sexton. (Keen, Robert)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Dale Osborn, Donny Powell, Michelle Sexton. (Keen, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference for 10/14/2021 02:00 PM per DE #16 to reflect Judge Collins. (mrm)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference for 10/14/2021 02:00 PM per DE #16 .(mrm)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE AND ORDER: This matter is set over for a SHOW-CAUSE hearing and preliminary pretrial conference on 10/14/2021, at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff is ORDERED to appear TELEPHONICALLY at the hearing. Defendants' counsel may also appear telephonically. At the hearing, Plaintiff Raymond D. Markley, Jr. is to show cause why he should not be sanctioned for his failure to appear at the September 27th preliminary pretrial conference. Plaintiff Raymond D. Markley, Jr. is ADVISED that if he fails to timely appear telephonically at the 10/14/2021, hearing and conference, additional sanctions may issue, up to and including monetary fines or dismissal of his lawsuit. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Notice and Order to Plaintiff Raymond D. Markley, Jr. at his address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 9/28/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed in order)(mrm)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TELEPHONIC HEARING (scheduled as a Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference) held on 9/27/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. The Court was unable to reach Plaintiff. Plaintiff failed to appear. Atty Robert Keen appeared on behalf of Defendants. Court sets Show Cause Hearing for 10/14/2021 at 2:00 pm. Court to initiate call. Plaintiff is to show cause for his failure to appear for the 9/27/2021 Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. (FTR 1st floor.)(copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff). (mr)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keen, Robert)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint, by Defendants Van Buren Civil Town of, Dale Osborn, Donny Powell, Michelle Sexton. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint #1 remains October 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 9/17/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: per #9 Van Buren Civil Town of answer due 10/12/2021; per #10 Dale Osborn answer due 10/12/2021; per #11 Donny Powell answer due 10/12/2021; per #12 Michelle Sexton answer due 10/12/2021. (rmc)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Sexton. (Keen, Robert)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donny Powell. (Keen, Robert)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dale Osborn. (Keen, Robert)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Van Buren Civil Town of. (Keen, Robert)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(mr)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint, by Defendants Van Buren Civil Town of, Dale Osborn, Donny Powell, Michelle Sexton. (Keen, Robert)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T Keen, Jr on behalf of Van Buren Civil Town of, Dale Osborn, Donny Powell, Michelle Sexton (Keen, Robert)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Van Buren Civil Town of, Michelle Sexton, Dale Osborn, Donny Powell. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) Waiver of Service due by 9/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (lhc)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DEFERRING payment of the filing fee; ORDERING the Plaintiff to pay the filing fee from any proceeds recovered in this case; and DIRECTING the Clerk to request Waiver of Service from (and, if necessary, the United States Marshal to serve process on) the Defendants at the addresses provided by Plaintiff on the Summons forms filed with his Complaint, with a copy of this Order and the Complaint, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d). Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 8/13/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Raymond D Markley, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas) Modified on 8/13/2021 (bas).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Van Buren Civil Town of, Dale Osborn, Donny Powell, Michelle Sexton, filed by Raymond D Markley, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM 285, #3 Envelope) (no summons received for Sexton, Osborn or Powell) (File stamped copy mailed to Markley) (bas) Modified on 8/12/2021 (bas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markley v. Civil Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond D Markley, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond D Markley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren Civil Town of
Represented By: Robert T Keen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Sexton
Represented By: Robert T Keen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Osborn
Represented By: Robert T Keen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Powell
Represented By: Robert T Keen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?