State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. v. United States of America
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00359
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.. (Moyer, Kevin)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (mrm)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.. (Moyer, Kevin)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nhc)
September 21, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nhc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L Moyer on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (Moyer, Kevin)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against United States of America( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4691644.), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Moyer, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Represented By: Kevin L Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?