Shaneyfelt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephanie L. Shaneyfelt
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00375
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/26/2021. (mr)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Stephanie L. Shaneyfelt. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/22/2021; U.S. Attorney General served on 10/21/2021; and U.S. Attorney served on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/21/2021. (bas)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS)(bas)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and WAIVING the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/4/2021. (cc: USMS)(bas)
October 1, 2021 **NEW CASE** **MOTION PENDING** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (jdb)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana M de la Torre on behalf of Stephanie L. Shaneyfelt (de la Torre, Adriana)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Stephanie L. Shaneyfelt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons USM 285)(de la Torre, Adriana)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Stephanie L. Shaneyfelt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(de la Torre, Adriana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaneyfelt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie L. Shaneyfelt
Represented By: Adriana M de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?