Davalos et al v. WTL Management Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos, Jamillette Gaxiola and Dessie Mitcheson
Defendant: WTL Management Incorporated, CGFW LLC and CGFW LLC doing business as Sirens Day and Night Club
Case Number: 1:2021cv00382
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 11:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
November 17, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: WTL Management Incorporated; answer due by December 9, 2021, per #8 . (lhc)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy J Grogg on behalf of WTL Management Incorporated (Grogg, Jeremy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by WTL Management Incorporated ; answer due by December 9, 2021. (Baker, Jared)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared P Baker on behalf of WTL Management Incorporated (Baker, Jared)
November 15, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: per #5 CGFW LLC answer due 12/9/2021. (rmc)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B Harding on behalf of CGFW LLC (Harding, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by CGFW LLC ; answer due by December 9, 2021. (Feighner, John)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John O Feighner on behalf of CGFW LLC (Feighner, John)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad A Catlin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Catlin, Brad)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CGFW LLC, WTL Management Incorporated. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nhc)
October 7, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nhc)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4708379.), filed by Mariana Davalos, Dessie Mitcheson, Jamillette Gaxiola. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Aronowitz, Edmund)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davalos et al v. WTL Management Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Brad A Catlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamillette Gaxiola
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Brad A Catlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessie Mitcheson
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Brad A Catlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTL Management Incorporated
Represented By: Jared P Baker
Represented By: Jeremy J Grogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CGFW LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CGFW LLC doing business as Sirens Day and Night Club
Represented By: Jeffrey B Harding
Represented By: John O Feighner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?