Randle v. Gladieux et al
Plaintiff: Payne T Randle and Payne Thomas Randle
Defendant: David Gladieux, Allen County Jail and Unkown U.S. Marshall
Case Number: 1:2021cv00425
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned from Payne T. Randle as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - No Longer Here - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward re #3 Order. (Order already sent to new address at DE #4 ) (bas)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned from Allen County Jail - Inmate Trust Fund as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - No Longer Here re #3 Order. (Order and ledger already sent to new address at DE #4 ) (bas)
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned from Payne T Randle as Undeliverable - No Longer Here - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward re #1 Pro Se Complaint. (bas) Modified on 11/30/2021 (bas).
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Payne T Randle from Allen County Jail to Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio. (Resent file stamped copy of #1 Complaint and #3 IFP Order to Randle) (Mailed #3 IFP Order and ledger to Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio) (bas) Modified on 11/30/2021 (bas).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDERING Payne T. Randle, IDOC # 161089, Allen County Jail #290994, to immediately pay $38.57 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 11/23/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se and Inmate Trust Fund Account as directed in Order)(mrm)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Payne T Randle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(bas)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Allen County Jail, David Gladieux, Unkown U.S. Marshall, filed by Payne T Randle. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(File stamped copy mailed to Randle)(bas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randle v. Gladieux et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payne T Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payne Thomas Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gladieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unkown U.S. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?