Walsh v. Uniquehab Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Martin J Walsh
Defendant: UNIQUEHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC d/b/a UNIQUEHAB SOLUTIONS, JOHN MUSILI, TONY ADURO and Uniquehab Solutions, LLC a limited liability company doing business as Uniquehab Solutions
Case Number: 1:2022cv00189
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2022 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
June 24, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tony Aduro, John Musili, Uniquehab Solutions, LLC. Tony Aduro waiver sent on 6/7/2022, answer due 8/8/2022; John Musili waiver sent on 6/7/2022, answer due 8/8/2022; Uniquehab Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 6/7/2022, answer due 8/8/2022. (Dubes, C)
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Kleber on behalf of Tony Aduro, John Musili, Uniquehab Solutions, LLC (Kleber, Rebecca)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by C Christopher Dubes on behalf of Tony Aduro, John Musili, Uniquehab Solutions, LLC (Dubes, C)
June 6, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tony Aduro, John Musili, Uniquehab Solutions, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
June 6, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (rmf)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Emelda Medrano on behalf of Martin J Walsh (Medrano, Emelda)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Martin J Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons UniqueHab Solutions, LLC dba UniqueHab Solutions, #4 Proposed Summons John Musili, #5 Proposed Summons Tony Aduro)(Medrano, Emelda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Uniquehab Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J Walsh
Represented By: Emelda Medrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIQUEHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC d/b/a UNIQUEHAB SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MUSILI
Represented By: C Christopher Dubes
Represented By: Rebecca Kleber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY ADURO
Represented By: C Christopher Dubes
Represented By: Rebecca Kleber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniquehab Solutions, LLC a limited liability company doing business as Uniquehab Solutions
Represented By: C Christopher Dubes
Represented By: Rebecca Kleber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?