Balance Authority LLC et al v. Hepler et al
Plaintiff: Balance Authority LLC and Solar Integrated Roofing Corp
Defendant: Corinne Hepler, U.S. Home Supplements LLC, Chad Freehauf, Emily Keen, Johanna Norton, Does, Roe Corporations, Johanna Freehauf, an individual, Does I through X and Roe Corporations I through X
Case Number: 1:2022cv00327
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: per #26 Emily Keen answer due 12/5/2022; U.S. Home Supplements LLC answer due 12/5/2022. (rmc)
November 7, 2022 Filing 28 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chad Freehauf, Johanna Norton.(McDonald, Jeremy)
November 7, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy McDonald on behalf of Defendant Chad Freehauf. (McDonald, Jeremy) Modified on 11/8/2022 to correct docket text and term as motion (rmc).
November 7, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE by Emily Keen, U.S. Home Supplements LLC of Initial Extension of Time of Defendants U.S. Home Supplements, LLC and Emily Keen to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Huber, Brent)
November 7, 2022 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Home Supplements LLC. (Huber, Brent)
November 7, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent W Huber on behalf of Emily Keen, U.S. Home Supplements LLC (Huber, Brent)
November 7, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Jorczak on behalf of Emily Keen, U.S. Home Supplements LLC (Jorczak, Robert)
November 4, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Defendant Johanna Norton. (McDonald, Jeremy) Modified to correct title and filing event to Notice instead of Motion on 11/7/2022 (nhc).
November 3, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Corinne Hepler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Riley, William)
November 3, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Corinne Hepler. (Riley, William)
October 19, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sundeep Singh on behalf of Corinne Hepler (Singh, Sundeep)
October 19, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William N Riley on behalf of Corinne Hepler (Riley, William)
October 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint A Zalas on behalf of Johanna Norton (Zalas, Clint)
October 10, 2022 Filing 16 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Balance Authority LLC, Solar Integrated Roofing Corp ; answer due by 11/7/2022. (Arnold PHV, Harry)
October 7, 2022 Filing 15 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Balance Authority LLC, Solar Integrated Roofing Corp ; answer due by 11/07/22. (Arnold PHV, Harry)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Harry Arnold PHV for Balance Authority LLC and Solar Integrated Roofing Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/7/2022. (ace)
October 6, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Balance Authority LLC. U.S. Home Supplements LLC served on 9/26/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Miller, David)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Chad F Clement PHV for Balance Authority LLC and Solar Integrated Roofing Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/6/2022. (ace)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexander K Calaway PHV for Balance Authority LLC and Solar Integrated Roofing Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/6/2022. (ace)
October 4, 2022 Filing 10 Application for Attorney Chad F. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Balance Authority LLC and Solar Integrated Roofing Corp. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5041010(Clement, Chad) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/5/2022) (ace).
October 4, 2022 Filing 9 Application for Attorney Harry L. Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Balance Authority LLC and Solar Integrated Roofing Corp. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5041006(Arnold, Harry)
October 4, 2022 Filing 8 Application for Attorney Alexander K. Calaway to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Balance Authority LLC and Solar Integrated Roofing Corp.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5040999(Calaway, Alexander)
October 4, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Balance Authority LLC. Corinne Hepler waiver sent on 9/26/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. (Miller, David)
October 3, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Balance Authority LLC. Johanna Norton served on 9/26/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Miller, David)
October 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Balance Authority LLC. Emily Keen served on 9/30/2022, answer due 10/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Miller, David)
October 3, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Balance Authority LLC. Chad Freehauf served on 9/28/2022, answer due 10/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Miller, David)
September 26, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chad Freehauf, Corinne Hepler, Emily Keen, Johanna Norton, U.S. Home Supplements LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
September 26, 2022 **NEW CASE** **MOTION PENDING** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (jdb)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Balance Authority LLC, Solar Integrated Roofing Corp. (Miller, David)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5030918.), filed by Solar Integrated Roofing Corp, Balance Authority LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Freehauf, #3 Proposed Summons Hepler, #4 Proposed Summons Keen, #5 Proposed Summons Norton, #6 Proposed Summons US Home Supplement)(Miller, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balance Authority LLC et al v. Hepler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balance Authority LLC
Represented By: David E Miller
Represented By: Chad F Clement PHV
Represented By: Harry Arnold PHV
Represented By: Alexander K Calaway PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solar Integrated Roofing Corp
Represented By: David E Miller
Represented By: Harry Arnold PHV
Represented By: Chad F Clement PHV
Represented By: Alexander K Calaway PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinne Hepler
Represented By: Sundeep Singh
Represented By: William N Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Home Supplements LLC
Represented By: Brent W Huber
Represented By: Robert A Jorczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Freehauf
Represented By: Jeremy J McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Keen
Represented By: Brent W Huber
Represented By: Robert A Jorczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johanna Norton
Represented By: Clint A Zalas
Represented By: Jeremy J McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johanna Freehauf, an individual
Represented By: Clint A Zalas
Represented By: Jeremy J McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Corporations I through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?