Williams v. Crunchtech Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin T. Williams
Defendant: Crunchtech Holdings, LLC d/b/a Atomic Filament, John Maly and Crunchtech Holdings, LLC doing business as Atomic Filament
Case Number: 1:2022cv00393
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lemert, Martha)
December 21, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, For Damages by John Maly.(Buchholz, James)
December 21, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, For Damages by Crunchtech Holdings, LLC.(Buchholz, James)
December 7, 2022 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
December 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2023 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
December 2, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin T. Williams. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lemert, Martha)
November 29, 2022 Set Deadlines per #7 Agreed Notice. Defendants Crunchtech Holdings, LLC and John Maly answer due by 12/21/2022. (ash)
November 29, 2022 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Crunchtech Holdings, LLC, John Maly ; answer due by December 21, 2022. (Buchholz, James) Modified on 11/30/2022 to change date(ash).
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Buchholz on behalf of All Defendants (Buchholz, James)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin T. Williams (Lemert, Martha)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha M Lemert on behalf of Benjamin T. Williams (Lemert, Martha)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin T. Williams re #1 Complaint, (Lemert, Martha)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Crunchtech Holdings, LLC, John Maly. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nhc)
November 4, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nhc)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5070082.), filed by Benjamin T. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons-Crunchtech, #4 Proposed Summons Summons-Maly)(Lemert, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Crunchtech Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin T. Williams
Represented By: Martha M Lemert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crunchtech Holdings, LLC d/b/a Atomic Filament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maly
Represented By: James P Buchholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crunchtech Holdings, LLC doing business as Atomic Filament
Represented By: James P Buchholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?