Petroleum Traders Corporation v. Mikon Logistics and Transportation LLC et al
Plaintiff: Petroleum Traders Corporation
Defendant: Mikon Logistics and Transportation LLC, Mikon Energy LLC and Daniel Guerrero, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00400
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR JUDGE HOLLY A BRADY: The Court being duly advised GRANTS Dft Daniel Guerro's #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to Pla's Response to Dft Daniel Guerro's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Dft Daniel Guerro's #13 Reply Brief to Petroleum Traders' Response Brief in Opposition to Dft Daniel Guerro's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is deemed timely filed. (cer)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The Court will set the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference in this matter after the District Judge rules on #8 Defendant Daniel Guerrero's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Text entry order.(mr)
January 3, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Response to Motion, by Defendant Daniel Guerrero, Jr. (Buchholz, James)
January 3, 2023 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Daniel Guerrero, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Buchholz, James)
December 21, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction - Petroleum Traders' Response Brief in Opposition to Defendant, Daniel Guerrero's, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Petroleum Traders Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Bradley V. Murphy with Exhibits A and B)(Grogg, Jeremy)
December 2, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Mikon Logistics and Transportation LLC.(Buchholz, James)
December 2, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Mikon Energy LLC.(Buchholz, James)
December 2, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Daniel Guerrero, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Buchholz, James)
December 2, 2022 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Daniel Guerrero, Jr. (Buchholz, James)
November 29, 2022 Filing 7 Defendant's Supplemental Jurisdiction Statement Jurisdiction Statement by Defendants Daniel Guerrero, Jr, Mikon Energy LLC, Mikon Logistics and Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buchholz, James) Modified docket entry text to reflect correct document title and terminate motion because document is not a motion on 11/30/2022 (nhc).
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Defendants are AFFORDED to and including 11/30/2022, to file a supplemental jurisdiction statement that adequately articulates each party's citizenship as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/16/2022. (mrm)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy J Grogg on behalf of Petroleum Traders Corporation (Grogg, Jeremy)
November 10, 2022 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Jacob Rotstein on behalf of All Defendants (Rotstein, Tyler)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Buchholz on behalf of All Defendants (Buchholz, James)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINNDC-5074893) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-2210-PL-000324, filed by Daniel Guerrero, Jr, Mikon Energy LLC, Mikon Logistics and Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit). (Buchholz, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petroleum Traders Corporation v. Mikon Logistics and Transportation LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petroleum Traders Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy J Grogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikon Logistics and Transportation LLC
Represented By: Tyler Jacob Rotstein
Represented By: James P Buchholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikon Energy LLC
Represented By: Tyler Jacob Rotstein
Represented By: James P Buchholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Guerrero, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler Jacob Rotstein
Represented By: James P Buchholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?