State of Indiana v. TikTok Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State of Indiana and Indiana State of
Defendant: TikTok Inc. and ByteDance Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00013
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Tienken PHV for Indiana State of. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/28/2023. (ace)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #21 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David H Thompson PHV for Indiana State of. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/28/2023. (ace)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #25 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney DeLisa L Ragsdale PHV for Indiana State of. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/28/2023. (ace)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter A Patterson PHV for Indiana State of. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/28/2023. (ace)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian W Barnes PHV for Indiana State of. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/28/2023. (ace)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension to File a Reply Brief is granted. Plaintiff granted to and including 3/17/2023 to file a reply brief in support of its motion to remand case. Text entry order. (mr)
February 23, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 First MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of Allen County, Indiana (Unopposed) by Plaintiff Indiana State of. (Barnhart, Scott)
February 23, 2023 Filing 25 Application for Attorney DeLisa L. Ragsdale to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of State of Indiana. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5169109 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ragsdale, DeLisa)
February 23, 2023 Filing 24 Application for Attorney John W. Tienken to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of State of Indiana. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5169098 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tienken, John)
February 23, 2023 Filing 23 Application for Attorney Brian W. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of State of Indiana. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5169089 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnes, Brian)
February 23, 2023 Filing 22 Application for Attorney Peter A. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of State of Indiana. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5169084 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Patterson, Peter)
February 23, 2023 Filing 21 Application for Attorney David H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of State of Indiana. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5169079 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Thompson, David)
February 17, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendants ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Inc.. (Pulliam, Daniel)
February 17, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 First MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of Allen County, Indiana filed by ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Inc.. (Pulliam, Daniel)
February 3, 2023 Filing 18 First MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of Allen County, Indiana by Plaintiff Indiana State of. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion)(Barnhart, Scott)
January 26, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L Barnhart on behalf of Indiana State of (Barnhart, Scott)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John E Hall PHV for ByteDance Ltd. and TikTok, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/26/2023. (ace)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Megan Crowley PHV for ByteDance Ltd. and TikTok Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/24/2023. (ace)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexander A Berengaut PHV for ByteDance Ltd. and TikTok Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/24/2023. (ace)
January 24, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory C Voight on behalf of Indiana State of (Voight, Cory)
January 24, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Betsy M DeNardi on behalf of Indiana State of (DeNardi, Betsy)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #7 Unopposed Motion to stay Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Complaint is granted. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is stayed for 30 days after resolution of the Plaintiff's anticipated motion for remand. Text entry order.(mr)
January 9, 2023 Filing 10 Application for Attorney John E. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of TikTok Inc. and ByteDance Ltd.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number BINNDC-5125832 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Pulliam, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2023: #3 PHV Motion and certificates) (ace).
January 9, 2023 Filing 9 Application for Attorney Alexander A. Berengaut to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of TikTok Inc. and ByteDance Ltd.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5125825 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Pulliam, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2023: #3 Pro Hac Appl and Certs) (ace).
January 9, 2023 Filing 8 Application for Attorney Megan A. Crowley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of TikTok Inc. and ByteDance Ltd.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5125820 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Pulliam, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2023: #3 Pro Hac Appl and Certs) (ace).
January 9, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 State Court Complaint by Defendants ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Inc.. (Pulliam, Daniel)
January 9, 2023 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal)
January 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Blake Alford on behalf of ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Inc. (Alford, Nicholas)
January 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Inc. (Pierson, Andrea)
January 6, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Inc.. (Pulliam, Daniel)
January 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E Pulliam on behalf of All Defendants (Pulliam, Daniel)
January 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINNDC-5123857) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-2212-PL-401, filed by ByteDance Ltd. and TikTok Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B, Complaint, #3 Exhibit C, Summons to TikTok, #4 Exhibit D, Summons to ByteDance, #5 Exhibit E, Consolidation Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pulliam, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Indiana v. TikTok Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana State of
Represented By: Brian W Barnes PHV
Represented By: David H Thompson PHV
Represented By: DeLisa L Ragsdale PHV
Represented By: John Tienken PHV
Represented By: Peter A Patterson PHV
Represented By: Scott L Barnhart
Represented By: Betsy M DeNardi
Represented By: Cory C Voight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Nicholas Blake Alford
Represented By: Daniel E Pulliam
Represented By: Megan Crowley PHV
Represented By: Alexander A Berengaut PHV
Represented By: John E Hall PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance Ltd.
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Nicholas Blake Alford
Represented By: Daniel E Pulliam
Represented By: Alexander A Berengaut PHV
Represented By: John E Hall PHV
Represented By: Megan Crowley PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?