ISS Land Management, LLC v. Thalassa Energy Project, LLC
Plaintiff: ISS LAND MANAGEMENT, LLC
Defendant: THALASSA ENERGY PROJECT, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00053
Filed: February 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and for Continuance of Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendant Thalassa Energy Project, LLC. (Gutwein, Matthew)
April 5, 2023 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gutwein, Matthew)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer is granted. Defendant granted to and including 4/10/2023 to file an Answer to Plaintiff's #6 Complaint. Text entry order.(mr)
March 8, 2023 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
March 8, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2023 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
March 7, 2023 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 State Court Complaint by Defendant Thalassa Energy Project, LLC. (Gutwein, Matthew)
February 13, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Thalassa Energy Project, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, - Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement (DeLaney, Kathleen)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant is afforded to and including 2/17/2023, to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges the citizenship of all the parties, including identifying each member of ISS Land Managment, LLC. and such member's citizenship. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/10/2023. (ash)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer is granted. Defendant granted to and including 3/13/2023 to file an Answer to Plaintiff's #6 Complaint. Text entry order.(mr)
February 8, 2023 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 State Court Complaint by Defendant Thalassa Energy Project, LLC. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
February 7, 2023 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal)
February 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Gutwein on behalf of THALASSA ENERGY PROJECT, LLC (Gutwein, Matthew)
February 6, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THALASSA ENERGY PROJECT, LLC identifying Corporate Parent B.P. p.l.c for THALASSA ENERGY PROJECT, LLC.. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
February 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by THALASSA ENERGY PROJECT, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Submission of Supplemental Exhibit to Notice of Removal (DeLaney, Kathleen)
February 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A DeLaney on behalf of THALASSA ENERGY PROJECT, LLC (DeLaney, Kathleen)
February 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5152482.) from DeKalb Superior Court II, Cause No. 17D02-2301-PL-000001, filed by THALASSA ENERGY PROJECT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeLaney, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISS Land Management, LLC v. Thalassa Energy Project, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISS LAND MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Eric M Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THALASSA ENERGY PROJECT, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R Gutwein
Represented By: Kathleen A DeLaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?