Rauen v. Rauen
Plaintiff: Nora Jean Rauen and Nora J Rauen
Defendant: Michelle Katherine Rauen and Michelle K Rauen
Case Number: 1:2023cv00197
Filed: May 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Michelle Katherine Rauen. (sej)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Michelle Katherine Rauen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sej)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER REMANDING CASE: The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion to Proceed IFP (ECF No. #2 ) and REMANDS this case to the Steuben County Circuit Court. The Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #5 ) is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 5/23/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party, certified copy of docket and order mailed Clerk, Steuben County Circuit Court)(ash)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Nora Jean Rauen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Glick, Dustin)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant Michelle Katherine Rauen. (sej)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michelle Katherine Rauen from Steuben Circuit Court, Cause No. 76C01-2212-PL000489, filed by Michelle Katherine Rauen. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Answer to Complaint (Kosciusko Circuit Court), #3 Supplemental Answer (Lagrange Superior Court), #4 Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Motion for IFP, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B pt. 1, #8 Exhibit B pt. 2, #9 Exhibit B pt. 3, #10 Envelope)(sej)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Nora Jean Rauen. Filed in Steuben Circuit Court 76C01-2212-PL-000489. (sej)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Michelle Katherine Rauen, filed by Nora Jean Rauen. Complaint filed in Steuben Circuit Court Case No. 76C01-2212-PL-489.(sej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rauen v. Rauen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Jean Rauen
Represented By: Dustin Alan Glick
Represented By: Dustin A Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora J Rauen
Represented By: Dustin A Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Katherine Rauen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle K Rauen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?