Bundy et al v. Transport Desgagnes Inc et al
Plaintiff: Edward W Bundy and Janette Bundy
Defendant: Transport Desgagnes Inc and M/V Catherine Desgagnes
Case Number: 2:2007cv00261
Filed: August 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: LaPorte
Presiding Judge: Robert L Miller Jr
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendants' 124 Motion for Judgment as a matter of law or for a new trial or for remittitur. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 6/9/2010. (rmn)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 75 Motion in Limine with respect to Janette Bundys emotional distress claim; GRANTING 78 Motion in Limine with respect to Points 1-8 and GRANTING the motion IN PART with respect to Point 9; GRANTING 79 Motion in Limine with respect to spoliation. None of these rulings are intended to be final. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/23/09. (mc)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING Transport Desgagnes and M/V Catherine Desgagnes 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. The final pretrial conference remains set for October 19, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. (South Bend time) in the third floor courtroom in South Bend, and trial of this cause remains scheduled to commence at 9:30 a.m. (Hammond time) on November 3, 2009 in the Hammond Federal Building. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/6/2009. (rmn)
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER affording plaintiffs 20 days from the date of this order within which to file an amended complaint alleging the existence of diversity jurisdiction. Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 9/3/2007. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller Jr on 8/14/2007. (rmn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bundy et al v. Transport Desgagnes Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward W Bundy
Represented By: Robert B Patterson PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette Bundy
Represented By: Robert B Patterson PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Desgagnes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Catherine Desgagnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?