September 30, 2014 |
Filing
760
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs 757 Motion for Reconsideration and reducing the award of costs against Plaintiffs in favor of Plymouth Defendants from $5,541.82 to $1,734; denying 758 Defendants motion to strike; denying 759 Defendants motion for summary ruling. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/30/14. cc: Miller plaintiffs (mc)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
756
OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 733 Motion to disallow the Marshall County Defendants' motion for costs; DENIES 734 Motion to disallow the Plymouth Defendants' motion for costs; GRANTS 738 Motion to amend bill of costs instanter; and GRANTS the Plymouth Defendants costs in the amount of $5,541.82. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/30/2013. cc: Pro se pltfs (tc)
|
September 27, 2013 |
Filing
754
OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 728 Motion for a New Trial; DENIES 735 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for a New Trial. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/27/2013. cc: Pro se Pltfs (tc)
|
December 14, 2012 |
Filing
721
MEMORANDUM OF ORDER: The Court reiterates the grant of Defendant Nicholas Laffoon's and Defendant Bruce Carter's motions for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 12/14/2012. cc: Pro se pltfs (tc)
|
October 24, 2012 |
Filing
681
OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 658 Marshall County Defendants' Motion to Reconsider; GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 663 Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider; and GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 660 Plymouth Defendants' Motion to Clarify and to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 10/24/2012. cc: Pro se Pltfs (tc)
|
September 30, 2012 |
Filing
678
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 561 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/29/12. (imr) Dkt text modified on 10/1/2012 to indicate Opinion and Order(kjp).
|
August 15, 2012 |
Filing
654
OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 567 & 572 Defendants' motions for summary judgment; DENIES 577 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; TERMINATES 602 , 603 , 604 , 605 , 606 , 607 , 610 & 635 Plymouth Defendant's motions to strike; and TERMINATES 637 Plaintiffs' motion to strike. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 8/15/2012. cc: Pro se Pltfs (tc)
|
March 30, 2012 |
Filing
611
OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 361 Motion to Strike Defendants' Expert's Report. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 3/30/2012. cc: Pro se Pltfs (tc)
|
February 3, 2012 |
Filing
560
OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 543 Joint Motion to Reconsider and DENIES 545 Joint Motion to Order the Plymouth Defendants to File the Deposition Transcript of Steven D Nicely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 2/3/2012. cc: Pro se Pltfs (tc)
|
December 15, 2011 |
Filing
540
ORDER: Court ADOPTS 495 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Cherry. Court DENIES 471 Plaintiffs' request for default judgment in the Joint Motion for Sanctions Against the Plymouth Defendants for Discovery Abuses and the remainder of Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Sanctions Against the Plymouth Defendants for Discovery Abuses. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 12/15/2011. cc: Pro se Pltfs (tc)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing
511
ORDER ACCEPTING 379 Report and Recommendations in its entirety; granting in part and denying in part 325 Joint Motion for Sanctions ; parties to submit payments within 14 days as set forth in order. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/30/11. (mc) Modified on 9/30/2011 to show cc: K. and J. Miller(mc).
|
May 18, 2011 |
Filing
393
OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 368 Joint Motion to Deem Facts Admitted but orders relief different than requested. The Court ORDERS that Defendants the City of Plymouth and Officer John Weir shall have up to and including 6/17/2011, in which to serve discovery responses in accordance with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/18/2011. cc: Pro se Plaintiffs (tc)
|
May 5, 2011 |
Filing
377
OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 320 Joint Motion to Strike the Plymouth Defendants' Discovery Responses at Docket Nos. 258 and 259; GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 321 Fourth Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendants City of Plymouth and John Weir; GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 323 Motion to Compel the Plymouth Defendants' Compliance in Discovery (Fifth Motion to Compel). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/5/2011. cc: Pro se Plaintiffs (tc)
|
April 15, 2011 |
Filing
354
OPINION AND ORDER: Court AFFIRMS Magistrate Judge Cherry's 294 Order denying sanctions and DENIES 302 Plaintiffs' Rule 72(a) motion for review. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 4/15/2011. cc: Jamila D Miller, Kevin D Miller (tc)
|
November 16, 2010 |
Filing
252
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING Defendant's 221 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and DENYING Plaintiffs' 231 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 11/16/2010. (rmn)
|
September 17, 2010 |
Filing
224
ORDER: Court overrules 207 Plaintiff's Objection and ACCEPTS 199 Judge Cherry's Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's 169 Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/17/2010. (tc) cc: Plaintiffs
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing
146
OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 123 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 5/27/2010. (jjj)
|
April 29, 2010 |
Filing
127
OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTS in part and DENIES in part 72 Motion to Bifurcate and Defer Discovery or, Motion in the Alternative for Protective Order; DENIES 73 Motion for Protective Order; GRANTS in part and DENIES as moot in part 95 Motion to Co mpel Discovery Responses from Defendant City of Plymouth; GRANTS in part and DENIES in part 96 First Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant John Weir. Supplemental Discovery Responses ddl 5/31/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/29/2010. (jjj)
|
April 9, 2010 |
Filing
119
OPINION AND ORDER that the Court denies both the Plaintiffs' 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs Joint Supplemental 27 Motion for Summary Judgment as to claims under Counts VII and IX. In addition, the Court denies the City Defendants and John Weir's 36 Motion to Strike various factual assertions of the Plaintiffs as moot. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 4/9/10. (cpy Pro Se Plaintiffs) (sda)
|