Plumbers & Pipefitters Welfare Fund Board of Trustees of the et al v. Matrix Plumbing and Heating Inc et al
Plaintiff: Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Welfare Fund Board of Trustees of the, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Pension Fund Board of Trustees of the, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund Board of Trustees of the, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Equality and Stabilization Fund Board of Trustees of the, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Voluntary 401(k) Fund Board of Trustees of the, Labor Management Committee The, Local Union No 172 United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada and Industry Advancement Fund
Defendant: Matrix Plumbing and Heating Inc, MKH Mechanical Inc, Joseph Laskowski and Matthew Keenon
Case Number: 2:2009cv00414
Filed: December 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 THIRD AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTS the Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 39 only as to the issue of liability. The Court FURTHER ORDERS Helms and MKH to submit to payroll compliance audit and provide Plaintiffs with all documents n ecessary to complete that audit as set forth in this order within 14 days of receiving service. The Court CONFIRMS a Telephonic Status Conference in this case to be held April 12, 2012 at 3:00 pm before Judge Theresa L Springmann. The Court will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/28/2012. (rmn)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SECOND AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS the Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 39 only as to the issue of liability. The Court further ORDERS Helms and MKH to submit to a payroll compliance audit and provide the Plaintiffs with all docu ments necessary to complete that audit for the time period beginning January 1, 2009 and ending, at the stated termination of the Subscription Agreement, on May 30, 2010.6 These documents should include payroll journals of MKH; individual earnings an d time records on all employees of MKH; quarterly withholding tax and PICA tax returns and annual earnings reports of MKH; report of miscellaneous income payments of MKH; summary of information returns of MKH; state Unemployment Compensation tax repo rts of MKH; employer copies of monthly contribution reports to all Funds submitted by MKH; all pertinent personnel file information of MKH; and cash disbursement records of MKH. Helms and MKH SHALL COMPLY with this Order within 14 days of receiving service. The Court CONFIRMS a Telephonic Status Conference in this case to be held March 22, 2012, at 1:30PM before Judge Theresa L. Springmann. The Court will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/1/2012. (rmn)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER: Grants the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 39 ONLY as to the issue of liability. The Court SETS a Telephonic Status Conference for 2/8/2012 at 1:30 pm before Judge Springmann to schedule further proceedings related to the determination of damages. Court to initiate call. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 2/6/2012. (rmn)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 OPINION AND ORDER granting 39 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 60 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Status Hearing. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/6/2012 02:00 PM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Judge Theresa L Springmann.) The Clerk will enter judgment in favor of the Plaintiffs and against the Defendants. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 1/9/2012. (rmn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plumbers & Pipefitters Welfare Fund Board of Trustees of the et al v. Matrix Plumbing and Heating Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Welfare Fund Board of Trustees of the
Represented By: Jennifer L Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Pension Fund Board of Trustees of the
Represented By: Jennifer L Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund Board of Trustees of the
Represented By: Jennifer L Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Equality and Stabilization Fund Board of Trustees of the
Represented By: Jennifer L Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Voluntary 401(k) Fund Board of Trustees of the
Represented By: Jennifer L Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labor Management Committee The
Represented By: Jennifer L Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union No 172 United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada
Represented By: Jennifer L Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industry Advancement Fund
Represented By: Jennifer L Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Plumbing and Heating Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MKH Mechanical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Laskowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Keenon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?