Howell v. CSX Transportation Inc
Plaintiff: Nicholas Howell
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc
Case Number: 2:2011cv00079
Filed: February 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 144 Motion for New Trial and Plaintiff's Objection to Costs is OVERRULED. Plaintiff is directed to pay costs as outlined in Defendant's 142 Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 1/27/2015. (tc)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPINION AND ORDER denying 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/21/13. (mc)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION & ORDER denying CSXTs 27 Motion to exclude the expert testimony of Dr. Kamal Chaban with permission to re-file; granting 37 Plaintiffs motion to amend the complaint and granting 44 Motion to expedite the ruling on said motion. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint DE [37-1] as a separate document within 10 days of this order. The Court DISMISSES WITH LEAVE TO RE-FILE CSXTs 40 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENIES CSXTs 46 Motion for summary ruling on the summary judgment motion. The Court SETS a dispositive motion deadline of Friday, May 3, 2013, with each party allowed to file only one summary judgment motion on any and all claims/defenses. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/18/13. (mc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. CSX Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Howell
Represented By: George T Brugess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc
Represented By: Barry L Loftus
Represented By: Sarah N Snoeberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?