Adams v. Traylor-Wolff et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Adams
Defendant: Lisa M Traylor-Wolff and Law Offices of Kelly Leeman
Case Number: 2:2011cv00365
Filed: October 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION AND ORDER denying 74 Motion to Bar and Exclude Expert Testimony; EXTENDING the deadline for the defendants to turn over their expert disclosures and reports until 8/29/2014 ; granting 79 Motion for Leave to file a sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 7/28/14. (mc)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 57 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/18/2013. cc: John R Hillis (tc)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 38 Motion to Dismiss by defendants Lisa M Traylor-Wolff and The Law Offices of Kelly Leeman; DENIES 52 Motion to Dismiss by Cass County and the Board Commissioners of the County of Cass. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 5/31/2013. cc: John R Hillis (tc)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; DENIES 11 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 7/25/2012. (tc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Traylor-Wolff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Adams
Represented By: Stephen J McMullen PHV
Represented By: Daniel G Suber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa M Traylor-Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Kelly Leeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?