Craig v. Lane et al

Plaintiff: Jason R Craig
Defendant: David Lane, Porter County Sheriff's Department, Kimberly House, Advanced Correctional Health Care, Nurse Harris, Cashan Walker, Dawn Martin, Dr Aishami and John Widup
Case Number: 2:2013cv00092
Filed: March 12, 2013
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
County: Porter
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2015 122 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Advanced Correctional Health Care, Dr Aishami, Kimberly House; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Ron Gaydos, Michelle Harris , David Lane, Dawn Martin, Ron Taylor, Cashan Walker, John Widup. To the extent it seeks summary judgment in favor of Nurse Walker and Nurse Martin for failing to provide Plaintiff with adequate dental care, the Motion is DENIED. The Motion is GRANTE D in all other respects. Clerk DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendants Warden John Widup, Captain Ron Taylor, Assistant Warden Ron Gaydos, Michelle Harris, Kimberly House, Dr. Al-Shami and Advanced Correctional Health Care. Plaintiff's claims that Nurse Walker and Nurse Martin failed to provide him adequate dental care remain PENDING. David Lane is DISMISSED. Plaintiff previously sought to be appointed counsel. Now that Plaintiff has passed the summary judgment stage, the Court is willing to re-examine whether an appointment of counsel is warranted, should he choose to renew his request for counsel. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/2/15. (cc: Jason R Craig). (cer). Modified on 9/3/2015. (cer)
July 25, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 17 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; DENIES 32 Motion for "contempt"; and DENIES 16 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 7/25/2013. cc: Craig (tc)
May 30, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Court DIRECTS the USMS to effect service of process on Kimberly House, Michelle Harris, Dawn Martin, John Widup, Cashan Walker, Dr. Alshami, Ron Taylor, Ron Gaydos, David Lane, and Advanced Correctional Health Care re 9 Amended Complaint and ORDERS the defendants to respond only to the claims for which the plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 5/30/2013. cc: USMS, Jason Craig (tc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason R Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Aishami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Widup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?