Vukadinovich v. Hanover Community School Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Brian Vukadinovich
Defendant: Hanover Community School Corporation, Hanover Community School Corporation Board of Trustees of the, Carol A Kaiser, Justin Biggs, Mary Joan Dickson, Julie Mueller, Pat Kocot and Dana Griner
Case Number: 2:2013cv00144
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Referring Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2016 415 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 411 Motion To Be Heard As To Petition For Judicial Notice Pursuant to Rule 201 of the Federal Rules of Evidence and denying 413 Motion For Relief From Judgment Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 60. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 11/2/16. (cc: Plaintiff). (nal)
October 12, 2016 409 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 382 Motion for Hearing on Damages; DENYING 389 Motion for New Trial as to the Retaliation Claim Due to the Plain Error of Omission of Jury Instruction; DENYING 391 Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding Verdict as to t he Compensatory Damages claim against Carol Kaiser; DENYING 392 Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding Verdict as to the Retaliation Claim against Hanover Community School Corp; DENYING 393 Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding Verdict As To the Age Discrimination Claim Against Hanover Corporation Community School; DENYING 394 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; DENYING AS MOOT 400 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Reference to Inadmissible Compromise Offers in Violation of Federal Rule of Evidence 408; DENYING AS MOOT 403 Petition for Judicial Notice. (cc: Pltf) Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 10/12/16. (mlc)
September 14, 2015 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff Vukadinovichs motion for partial summary judgment on the due process issue is DENIED. 279 Defendants motion for summary judgment 285 is DENIED with respect to the ADEA and retaliation claims against the School but GRANTED with r espect to the individual defendants; GRANTED with respect to the state statute and contract claims; DENIED with respect to the constitutional Due Process claims (it only applies as against Biggs and Kaiser in their individual and official capacities , and the School through the official capacity claims); and GRANTED with respect to the attempts at stand-alone section 1983 claims (sounding in a failure to train and implementing an unconstitutional policy). Defendants motion for leave to file exc esspages in support of their motion is GRANTED. 283 Pla motion to file excessive pages is also GRANTED. 291 Pla motion for oral argument on his motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED. 288 Pla motion for leave to submit an inadvertently omitted exhibit (his own affidavit) is GRANTED. 294 Pla motion to strike the defendants brief in support of their motion for summary judgment is DENIED. 295 Pla motion for leave to file a supplementary exhibit (an e-mail he received on Septembe r 1, 2014) is DENIED. 296 The defendants request in their reply in support of their motion for summary judgment that two of Pla affidavits be stricken is not a motion, and therefore requires no disposition. [298 at 2-4.] Pla motion to strike the defendants reply in support of their motion for summary judgment is DENIED. 300 Pla motion for leave to submit (another) supplemental exhibit 302 documents from a September 2014 school board meeting evidence created several months after the cl ose of discovery, and after summary judgment briefing was complete) is DENIED. Pla third opposed motion to file a supplemental exhibit is DENIED for the same reasons as the other two pending motions seeking to submit supplemental exhibits. 303 P la motion for sanctions is DENIED. 309 The dates for trial and the final pretrial conference were vacated in a previousorder (DE 323), and no new date was set then. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/15/2015 01:30 PM in US District Court - Hammond before Chief Judge Philip P Simon.) Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 9/14/2015. (cc: Vukadinovich) (rmn)
March 26, 2015 323 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 321 MOTION for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority filed by Brian Vukadinovich, and granting 315 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Justin Biggs, Dana Griner, Mary Joan Dickson, Hanover Communi ty School Corporation, Hanover Community School Corporation Board of Trustees of the, Tony Hiatt, Julie Mueller, Pat Kocot, Carol A Kaiser. The current trial setting of June 1, 2015 and final pretrial conference setting of April 17 are VACATED. New dates for trial and the finalpretrial conference will be set when the Court issues its Opinion and Order addressing the numerous outstanding motions. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 3/26/15. cc:pltf(kjp)
February 20, 2014 197 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Co mpel; granting 84 Motion for Protective Order; denying 89 Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike ; denying 96 Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike ; granting 99 Motion to Compel; granting 132 Motion to Compel; granting 158 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 161 Motion to Compel; denying 162 Motion to Compel; denying 163 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion to Compel; gra nting in part and denying in part 166 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 167 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 168 Motion to Compel. The deadline by which all discovery in this case shall be completed is extended to April 30, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 2/10/2014. (cc: Vukadinovich) (rmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vukadinovich v. Hanover Community School Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Vukadinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Community School Corporation
Represented By: Marsha Volk Bugalla
Represented By: Thomas E Wheeler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Community School Corporation Board of Trustees of the
Represented By: Marsha Volk Bugalla
Represented By: Thomas E Wheeler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol A Kaiser
Represented By: Marsha Volk Bugalla
Represented By: Thomas E Wheeler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Biggs
Represented By: Marsha Volk Bugalla
Represented By: Thomas E Wheeler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Joan Dickson
Represented By: Marsha Volk Bugalla
Represented By: Thomas E Wheeler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Mueller
Represented By: Marsha Volk Bugalla
Represented By: Thomas E Wheeler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Kocot
Represented By: Marsha Volk Bugalla
Represented By: Thomas E Wheeler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Griner
Represented By: Marsha Volk Bugalla
Represented By: Thomas E Wheeler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?