Tyler v. Lain et al
Plaintiff: |
William R Tyler |
Defendant: |
David Lain, Rob Taylor, Jon Widup, Haigh, Aylea and Michelle Harris |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00331 |
Filed: |
September 19, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Hammond Office |
County: |
Porter |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul R Cherry |
Presiding Judge: |
Jon E DeGuilio |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
66
OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 47 Motion for Summary Judgment and Tyler's claim that he was subjected to substandard prison conditions by Sheriff Lain, Warden Widup and Assistant Warden Gaydos, as well as his claim that he was subjected to the use of excessive force by Officers Alyea, Fishback and Haigh, are dismissed pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a). Tyler's claim against Michele Harris for denying him adequate medical care remains pending. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 2/27/2015. cc: Tyler (tc)
|
March 7, 2014 |
Filing
21
OPINION AND ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed on a claim against Jon Widup, David Lain, and Ronald Gaytose in their individual capacities for monetary damages for housing him in an overcrowded cell without adequate bedding; GRANTS the plainti ff leave to proceed on a claim against Michael Fishback, Christopher Haigh, and Donald Aleya in their individual capacities for monetary damages for using excessive force against him; GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed on a claim against Megan Har ris in her individual capacity for monetary damages for denying him adequate medical care;DISMISSES Robert Taylor and Andrew Noel as defendants; DISMISSES any and all other claims contained in the complaint; GRANTS the motion for service (DE 20), and DIRECTS the U.S. Marshals Service to effect service of process on David Lain, John Widup, Ronald Gaytose, Megan Harris, Michael Fishback, Christopher Haigh, and Donald Aleya pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d); ORDERS David Lain, John Widup, Ronald Gaytose, Megan Harris, Michael Fishback,Christopher Haigh, and Donald Aleya to respond, as provided for in the FedRCivP and N.D. IND. L.R. 10-1, only to the claims for which the pro se plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order; andDENIES the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (DE 19) as unnecessary. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/7/2014. (cc: Tyler) (rmn)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?