Harrison v. Jaques et al
Plaintiff: Gary Joe Harrison
Defendant: J Jaques, Captain Morris, Jeff Bang, Greg Manee, D Borgetti, St Catherine Hospital and Allison O'Keefe
Case Number: 2:2015cv00037
Filed: January 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING 93 Verified MOTION to Alter or Amend Summary Judgment Opinion and Order re 90 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Gary Joe Harrison and DENYING 96 MOTION to Advise Court and Request for Civil Rule 59 Relief by Plaintiff Gary Joe Harrison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 1/9/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the 85 Motion to Strike Non-Sworn Statements Contained in Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTS the 79 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Town of Griffith, Griffith Police Department, Jason Jacques, Tony Morris, Greg Mance, and David Borgetti and against Plaintiff Gary Joe Harrison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 10/19/2017. (jss)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPINION AND ORDER denying 61 Verified MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Borgetti, Tony Morris, Greg Mance, Griffith Police Department, Town of Griffith, Jason Jacques. The Court SETS this matter for an in-person status conference for inquiry on attorney representation for September 6, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. (C.S.T.). Plaintiff Gary Harrison is ORDERED to appear in person at the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 8/16/06. cc:cert & reg mail w/docket sheet(kjp)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPINION AND ORDER re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by Defendants David Borgetti, Griffith Police Department, Jason Jacques, Greg Mance, Tony Morris, Town of Griffith; 62 NOTICE of Service of Motion to Dismiss on Plaintiff and Reque st for Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by David Borgetti, Griffith Police Department, Jason Jacques, Greg Mance, Tony Morris, Town of Griffith. The 61 MOTION is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT and the Motion contained within 62 NOTICE is GRAN TED. Plaintiff Gary Joe Harrison ORDERED to file by 7/29/2016 a Notice providing his current address and telephone number as well as a Response, if any, to the Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff WARNED that if he fails to comply with this Opinion and Order , the Court is likely to grant the Motion to Dismiss. Clerk DIRECTED to serve by mail this Opinion and Order along with a copy of the Court's May 17, 2016 Order (DE 58 ) and a copy of Defendant's Verified Motion to Dismiss (DE 61 ) on Plaintiff at the addresses outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 7/13/16. (cc: Gary Joe Harrison (at the 3 addresses contained in Order)). (cer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Jaques et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Joe Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Jaques
Represented By: Sheri Bradtke McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Morris
Represented By: Sheri Bradtke McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bang
Represented By: Sheri Bradtke McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Manee
Represented By: Sheri Bradtke McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Borgetti
Represented By: Sheri Bradtke McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Catherine Hospital
Represented By: Christopher Donald Hammer
Represented By: Stephen A Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?