Komoscar et al v. Pence et al
Plaintiff: Timothy J Komoscar and Kelly A Komoscar
Defendant: Michael R Pence, Mary Beth Bonaventura, Indiana Department of Child Services, Terrance K Ciboch, Louella F Richey, Tamara G Loomis and Brittney D Schmidt
Case Number: 2:2015cv00256
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Porter
Presiding Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Tamara G Loomis, Brittney D Schmidt. The claims of deprivations of constitutional rights through misrepresentations made to the state court are DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of federal jurisdiction. On the remaining claims, the Court GRANTS summary judgment in favor of Defendants. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 6/10/2021. (lhc)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 80 Motion to Seal. The Court STRIKES Docket Entry 78 and DIRECTS the Clerk to MAINTAIN UNDER SEAL Docket Entry 79. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/22/17. (ksp)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 71 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Timothy J Komoscar, Kelly A Komoscar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/19/2017. (lns)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING 43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Partial by Defendants Mary Beth Bonaventura, Terrance K Ciboch, Indiana Department of Child Services, Tamara G Loomis, Michael R Pence, Louella F Richey, Brittney D Schmidt as fol lows: The Court DISMISSES Section 1983 claims against defendants Pence and Bonaventura; DISMISSES Indiana constitutional claims against all defendants; DISMISSES Indiana tort claims against DCS without prejudice; and DISMISSES Indiana tort claims against defendants Ciboch, Richey, Loomis, and Schmidt. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/6/2016. (lhc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Komoscar et al v. Pence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J Komoscar
Represented By: Adam John Sedia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly A Komoscar
Represented By: Adam John Sedia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R Pence
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Lemmon
Represented By: Melinda J Schwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Bonaventura
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Lemmon
Represented By: Melinda J Schwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Department of Child Services
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Lemmon
Represented By: Melinda J Schwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance K Ciboch
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Lemmon
Represented By: Melinda J Schwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louella F Richey
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Lemmon
Represented By: Melinda J Schwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara G Loomis
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Lemmon
Represented By: Melinda J Schwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney D Schmidt
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Lemmon
Represented By: Melinda J Schwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?