Bostic v. Pence et al
Plaintiff: Lorena E. Bostic
Defendant: Indiana State of, Lake County, Indiana, Board of Commissioners, Roosevelt Allen, Jr, Gerald J. Scheub, Michael C. Repay, Salvadore Vasquez, Clarence D. Murray, Diane Ross Boswell, Thomas P Stefaniak, Jr, Samuel L. Cappas, Jan Parsons, Miroslav Radiceski and Lake County Indiana
Case Number: 2:2015cv00429
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 OPINION AND ORDER The Court DENIES the Motion of Plaintiff Lorena E. Bostic for Oral Argument on Defendant Samuel L. Cappass' Motion for Summary Judgment DE 151 , GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment DE 139 , and ORDERS that sum mary judgment is granted in favor of Defendant Samuel L. Cappas onPlaintiff Lorena E. Bostic's claim against him. The Court DISMISSES Defendant Samuel L. Cappas from this cause of action. The case REMAINS PENDING as to the other defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/9/18. (kjp)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 OPINION AND ORDER The Court GRANTS the Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum DE 125 and the Motion for Protective Order DE 126 . The Court QUASHES the July 23, 2018 and July 27, 2018 subpoenas duces tecum issued to Defendants Clarence D. Murray and Diane Ross Boswell. See (DE 125-1 and 125-2). The Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff is forbidden from seeking discovery from the individual Defendant Judges Salvador Vasquez, Clarence D. Murray, Diane Ross Boswell, Thomas P. Stefaniak, Jr., and Samuel L. Cappas regarding their personal financial information and that these Defendant Judges need not respond to Plaintiffs July 3, 2018 discovery requests. See (DE 126-1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 8/23/18. (kjp)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING 114 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Diane Ross Boswell, Samuel L. Cappas, Clarence D. Murray, Thomas P Stefaniak, Jr, Salvadore Vasquez. The Court ORDERS that Miroslav Radiceski's Crossclaim 90 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/20/2018. (lhc)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 91 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Diane Ross Boswell, Samuel L. Cappas, Salvadore Vasquez, Clarence D. Murray, Thomas P S tefaniak, Jr. The Court ORDERS that the § 1983 claims in Count I against Defendants Salvador Vasquez, Clarence D. Murray, Diane Ross Boswell, Thomas P. Stefaniak, Jr., and Samual L. Cappas based on the issuance of the October 30, 2014 ex parte order are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court further ORDERS that the claims in Count I against these Defendants otherwise REMAIN PENDING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/12/18. (ksp)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the 76 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE the proposed Second Amended Complaint with the modifications ordered herein as well as the proposed summons for Defendants Vasquez, Murray, Boswell, Stefaniak and Cappas on or before 12/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 12/8/2017. (jss)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 61 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Diane Ross Boswell, Samuel L Cappas, Clarence D Murray, Thomas P Stefaniak, Jr, Salvadore Vasquez. The only remaining claims (which are in Count 1) against Defendants Diane Ross Boswell, Samuel L Cappas, Clarence D Murray, Thomas P Stefaniak, Jr and Salvadore Vasquez are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 10/2/17. (cer)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Diane Ross Boswell, Samuel L. Cappas, Indiana State of, Clarence D. Murray, Thomas P Stefaniak, Jr, Salvadore Vasquez; GRANTING [ 29] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Official Capacity by Defendant Miroslav Radiceski; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Defendant Jan Parsons. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 9/27/16. (cer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bostic v. Pence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena E. Bostic
Represented By: J Michael Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana State of
Represented By: Nikki G Ashmore
Represented By: Jonathan P Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County, Indiana, Board of Commissioners
Represented By: John M Kopack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosevelt Allen, Jr
Represented By: John M Kopack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald J. Scheub
Represented By: John M Kopack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Repay
Represented By: John M Kopack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvadore Vasquez
Represented By: Nikki G Ashmore
Represented By: Jonathan P Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence D. Murray
Represented By: Nikki G Ashmore
Represented By: Jonathan P Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Ross Boswell
Represented By: Nikki G Ashmore
Represented By: Jonathan P Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P Stefaniak, Jr
Represented By: Nikki G Ashmore
Represented By: Jonathan P Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel L. Cappas
Represented By: Nikki G Ashmore
Represented By: Jonathan P Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Parsons
Represented By: Caleb Sean Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas A Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miroslav Radiceski
Represented By: Tony Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Indiana
Represented By: John M Kopack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?