Norman v. B.E.T. Television et al
Plaintiff: LaSandra Norman
Defendant: B.E.T. Television, Steven Hill, Debra Lee and Wendy Williams
Case Number: 2:2016cv00113
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 42 B.E.T.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and DISMISSES the amended complaint without prejudice. The 47 Motion Proceed to Trial is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/5/2016. (cc: L. Norman) (jss)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 32 Motion of B.E.T. Television to clarify and DISMISSES Ms. Norman's complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim against B.E.T. Television upon which relief can be granted. Ms. Norman is AFFORDED twenty days from this date to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/25/2016. cc: Norman (tc)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 24 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction against Stephen Hill, Debra Lee, and Wendy (Hunter) Williams. Ms. Norman's claims against defendant B.E.T. Television remain pending. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/18/2016. cc: Norman (tc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. B.E.T. Television et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaSandra Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.E.T. Television
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?