Razon et al v. Vyas

Plaintiff: Zayda Razon, Michaela Rice, Candace Hill and Gwenell White
Defendant: Daksha Vyas
Case Number: 2:2016cv00441
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court hereby ADOPTS the 42 Report and Recommendation. Accordingly, the 34 Joint Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement is GRANTED, the terms of the Settlement Agreement are APPROVED as fair, reasonable, appropriate and in accordance with the law, and the parties are ORDERED to carry out the terms of the settlement agreement promptly and in good faith. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 9/11/2017. (jss)
July 6, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES the 30 Joint Motion to Seal Confidential Settlement Agreement and GIVES LEAVE to the parties to withdraw their Joint Motion to Approve Confidential General Release and Settlement Agreement on or before 7 /14/2017. If they do not do so, the Court will rule on the Joint Motion to Approve the Confidential General Release and Settlement Agreement and will order the Clerk of Court to UNSEAL the Confidential General Release and Settlement Agreement pursuant to this Opinion and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/6/2017. (jss)
June 14, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The Court TAKES UNDER ADVISEMENT 30 Joint MOTION to Seal Confidential Settlement Agreement by Defendant Daksha Vyas and ORDERS the parties to file a brief by no later than 6/21/2017, as outlined in Order. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to maintain the Confidential General Release and Settlement Agreement 35 under SEAL until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/14/2017. (lhc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Razon et al v. Vyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zayda Razon
Represented By: Robin G Remley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaela Rice
Represented By: Robin G Remley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Hill
Represented By: Robin G Remley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwenell White
Represented By: Robin G Remley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daksha Vyas
Represented By: David J Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?