Major v. State of Indiana et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Major
Defendant: Indiana State of and Indiana Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2017cv00012
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Porter
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 39 MOTION for Reconsideration on Final Order of Court filed by Barbara Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/14/19. (kjp)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES the Motion for Reconsideration (DE 36) and will not disturb the judgment entered in favor of Defendants State of Indiana and Indiana Department of Corrections and against Plaintiff Barbara Major as to all the claims in her Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/29/19. (ksp)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Defendants State of Indiana and Indiana Department of Corrections and against Plaintiff Barbara Major as to all the claims in her Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/7/18. (ksp)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER granting 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Indiana Department of Corrections, Indiana State of. Judgment is granted in favor of Defendants only on Plaintiff's claims for racial discrimination and punitive damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/23/17. (ksp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Major v. State of Indiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Major
Represented By: Thomas F Godfrey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?