Doe v. Purdue University et al
Plaintiff: |
John Doe |
Defendant: |
Purdue University, Purdue University Board of Trustees, Mitchell Elias Daniels, Jr., Alysa Christmas Rollock, Katherine Sermersheim, Erin Oliver and Jacob Amberger |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00033 |
Filed: |
January 24, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Hammond Office |
County: |
Grant |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul R Cherry |
Presiding Judge: |
Jon E DeGuilio |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 14, 2023 |
Filing
224
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART John Doe's Motion for Reconsideration [DE 208], and DISMISSES Defendants' Amended Counterclaim [DE 161]. The Court DENIES all other relief requested in the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 2/14/2023. (tc)
|
August 11, 2022 |
Filing
206
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants' motion for summary judgment 177 . Plaintiff's due process claim (Count I) is dismissed, while his Title IX claim (Count II) remains pending. DENIES Plaintiff' ;s motion for partial summary judgment 181 . GRANTS Defendants' motion to strike the opinion of Plaintiff's expert 193 . The opinion of Dr. Christopher Barden is excluded from the summary judgment record and may not be used at trial and GRANTS Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings 203 . Plaintiff's claim for "emotional and psychological damages" in connection with Count II is dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/11/2022. (mrm)
|
January 11, 2021 |
Filing
143
OPINION AND ORDER The Court DENIES the 115 Motion to Quash Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Mr. Noel Perry. The Court ORDERS Noel Perry to appear for a deposition at a time and date agreed upon by Mr. Perry, Plaintiff, and Defendants. Finally, the Court DENIES Defendants' request for attorneys' fees and costs incurred in response to the motion to quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/11/21. (kjp)
|
May 19, 2020 |
Filing
84
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 MOTION to Dismiss Section 1983 Damage Claims, Due Process Claims, and Injunctive Relief Claims filed by Defendants Purdue University Board of Trustees, Mitchell Elias Daniels, Jr., Alysa Christmas Rollock and Katherine Sermersheim, as outlined in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 5/19/20. (efc)
|
March 31, 2020 |
Filing
70
OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING as moot 43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jacob Amberger, Mitchell Elias Daniels, Jr., Erin Oliver, Purdue University, Purdue University Board of Trustees, Alysa Christmas Rollock, Kather ine Sermersheim. The Court intends to rule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Section 1983 Damage Claims, Due Process Claims, and Injunctive Relief Claims 58 in the next 45 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/31/2020. (lhc)
|
September 19, 2019 |
Filing
61
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the Verified Motion for Issuance of a Subpoena 45 . The Court will execute the subpoena attached as Exhibit E to Defendants' motion. A signed copy of the subpoena will be filed at the next docket entry. The Court AUTHORIZES Defendants to issue the signed subpoena to non-parties the Navy, NROTC and Purdue NROTC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/19/2019. (jss)
|
November 15, 2017 |
Filing
31
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Complaint as to all counts. The Court (1) dismisses without prejudice the claims for injunctive relief in Counts I and II; (2) dismisses without prejudice the state law contract claims in Counts III and IV; (3) dismisses without prejudice all § 1983 claims against Defendants Purdue University, the Purdue University Board of Trustees, and the individual defendants in their official capaci ties; (4) dismisses with prejudice all claims against Defendant Daniels in his individual capacity; (5) dismisses with prejudice the § 1983 damages claims against the individual defendants in their individual capacities for failure to state a claim; and (6) dismisses with prejudice the Title IX claims in Count II for failure to state a claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/15/2017. (jss)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?