MC Express Inc et al v. Neushwander et al

Plaintiff: MC EXPRESS, INC., Rick Dyer and MC Express Inc
Defendant: Eric E Neushwander, Kelli D Neushwander and Tonette Evans
Case Number: 2:2018cv00263
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Court GRANTS #9 Amended Motion for Leave to Vacate Any and All Procedural Defaults and for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint. Defendants Tonette Evans, Eric E Neushwander, Kelli D Neushwander to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs' complaint by 9/28/2018. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 8/30/2018. Text entry only. (tc)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Eric E Neushwander, Kelli D Neushwander. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Levine PHV, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE #7 Motion for Leave to Vacate Any and All Procedural Defaults and for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint. Pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 6-1, the defendants have not indicated that there is no objection to the extension, or their efforts to get the opposing party to agree to the extension if there is an objection. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 8/28/2018. Text entry only. (tc)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Eric E Neushwander, Kelli D Neushwander. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Levine PHV, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey Jay Levine PHV for Tonette Evans, Eric E Neushwander, and Kelli D Neushwander. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 8/27/2018. (mtr)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 Application for Attorney Jeffrey J. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Neushwander and Evans. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3662144 (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Motion & Draft Order, #3 Notice of Filing)(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tonette Evans, Eric E Neushwander, Kelli D Neushwander. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
July 16, 2018 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (New Case) (sct)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle B Lawrence on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lawrence, Kyle)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Terpstra, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Terpstra, John)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3621675.), filed by MC EXPRESS, INC., Rick Dyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons to Eric and Kelli Neushwander, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to Eric Neushwander, #4 Proposed Summons Summons to Kelli Neushwander, #5 Proposed Summons Summons to Tonette Evans)(Terpstra, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MC Express Inc et al v. Neushwander et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric E Neushwander
Represented By: Jeffrey Jay Levine PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli D Neushwander
Represented By: Jeffrey Jay Levine PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonette Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey Jay Levine PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MC EXPRESS, INC.
Represented By: John R Terpstra, III
Represented By: Kyle B Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Dyer
Represented By: John R Terpstra, III
Represented By: Kyle B Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MC Express Inc
Represented By: John R Terpstra, III
Represented By: Kyle B Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?