Lloyd-Schultz v. United States Steel Corporation

Plaintiff: Sherry Lloyd-Schultz
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00359
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
0 Judge: John E Martin
1 Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2018 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (smb)
November 19, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2019 10:15 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery order in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due on or before 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/19/2018. (smb)
November 16, 2018 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States Steel Corporation.(Austgen, Terence)
November 2, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/2/2018. (smb)
October 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 11/16/2018 per DE #4. (ksp)
October 23, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M Bezak on behalf of United States Steel Corporation (Bezak, Elizabeth)
October 23, 2018 4 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by United States Steel Corporation ; answer due by 11/16/2018. (Austgen, Terence)
October 23, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Terence M Austgen on behalf of United States Steel Corporation (Austgen, Terence)
September 24, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to United States Steel Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
September 24, 2018 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (sct)
September 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United States Steel Corporation( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3687010.), filed by Sherry Lloyd-Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bodensteiner, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd-Schultz v. United States Steel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Lloyd-Schultz
Represented By: Ivan E Bodensteiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth M Bezak
Represented By: Terence M Austgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?