Adams et al v Atlantic Richfield Company et al
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE GRIFFIN, MICHELLE GARCIA, individually, and as mother and next friend of E.C., G.G., M.G., A.G.2, and J.G., WILLIE MOORE, DENNIS RUFFINS, individually, and as father and next friend of I.W. and L.W., MARIBEL GAMEZ, individually, and as mother and next friend of A.G.1 AND A.G.H., LIDUVINA ESPINOSA, VALERIE MALLETTE, AFRICA MCKINNEY, individually, and as mother and next friend of J.A., J.M., and D.W., MARK COLE, ANGELENE RIVERA, individually, and as mother and next friend of D.R.2, A.R.1, and A.R.2, DESHAUN SANDERS, MINERVA RAMIREZ, individually, and as mother and next friend of D.R.1, C.R., and M.R., MAXINE TUCKER, individually, and as mother and next friend of A.E.2, O.G.1, O.G.2, and L.G., ANGELA ESPINOZA, individually, and as mother and next friend of A.E.1, R.E., N.C., A.C., and K.C., JOSE BLAS CRUZ ROQUE, individually and as father and next friend of L.C.C., RHONDA COLLIER, individually, and as mother and next friend of J.J., DESHEENA ADAMS, individually, and as mother and next friend of C.B.1, C.B. 2, C.H., and C.A., RONNITA HALL, LETICIA M. DE LUNA, individually, and as mother and next friend of S.C., I.L., I.O., C.D., DONNETTA DILLON, individually, and as mother and next friend of, A.D. 1, A.D. 2, A.J., D.S. 1, D.S. 2, D.S. 3, D.S.4, ANGELINA GUTEIRREZ DE CRUZ, VANESSA MCKINZEY, individually, and as mother and next friend of A.W. and D.M., ANGELA THORNTON, individually, and as mother and next friend of J.P., BREANNA WASHINGTON, individually, and as mother and next friend of C.W. and K.W.2, Roberto Cabello, Jr., ARCELLA CRUZ, KENDRA MABRY, individually, and as mother and next friend of K.W.1, M.C.1, M.C.2, J.W.1, and J.W.2, Minerva Ramirez, Rhonda Collier, Jose Blas Cruz Roque, Leticia M De Luna, Desheena Adams, Africa McKinney, Deshun Sanders, Kendra Mabry, Michelle Garcia, Lasharday White, Arcelia Cruz, Angelene Rivera, Angela Espinoza, Angela Thornton, Vanessa McKinzey, Donetta Dillon, Dennis Ruffins, Maribel Gamez, Breanna Washington and Maxine Tucker
Defendant: HALSTAB, LLC, HAMMOND LEAD PRODUCTS, LLC, Tesoro Corporation, Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., Mueller Industries, Inc., U.S. SMELTER AND LEAD REFINERY, INC. d/b/a U.S.S. Lead Refinery, Inc., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, BP AMOCO PLC, Mining Remedial Recovery Company, Hammond Group, Inc., The Chemours Company, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BP West Coast Products LLC, HALOX, LLC, U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc. and U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc. doing business as U.S.S. Lead Refinery, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00375
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
2 Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING #128 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by BP West Coast Products LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company. The appearance of Attorney Jesse M. Feitel on behalf of Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/15/2020. (mrm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 128 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Feitel PHV, Jesse)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #126 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response to #122 #125 #119 #121 #116 #118 #113 #115 #111 be filed by 11/3/2020. Reply to be filed by 12/3/2020.Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/8/2020. No pdf attached.(cp)
September 4, 2020 Filing 126 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #121 MOTION Judicial Request For Judicial Notice in Support of Mining Remedial Recovery, #122 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #116 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #115 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice re #113 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties , #113 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties, #125 MOTION re #122 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judicial Notice, #119 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #118 MOTION to Dismiss Request for Judicial Notice in Support of by Plaintiff Desheena Adams. (Mendoza, Roberto (Alex))
August 21, 2020 Filing 125 MOTION re #122 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judicial Notice by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 DESIGNATION OF EVIDENCE FOR THEIR REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Reiter PHV, Diana)
August 21, 2020 Filing 124 MOTION for Hearing re #123 Brief in Support, #122 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Reiter PHV, Diana)
August 21, 2020 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM in Support of #122 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BP West Coast Products LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company. (Reiter PHV, Diana) Modified on 8/24/2020 (bas).
August 21, 2020 Filing 122 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Reiter PHV, Diana)
August 21, 2020 Filing 121 MOTION Judicial Request For Judicial Notice in Support of Mining Remedial Recovery by Defendants Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., Mueller Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Kelln, H)
August 21, 2020 Filing 120 BRIEF in Support of #119 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., Mueller Industries, Inc.. (Kelln, H)
August 21, 2020 Filing 119 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., Mueller Industries, Inc.. (Kelln, H)
August 21, 2020 Filing 118 MOTION to Dismiss Request for Judicial Notice in Support of by Defendant U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Kelln, H)
August 21, 2020 Filing 117 BRIEF in Support of #116 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc.. (Kelln, H) Modified on 8/24/2020 (bas).
August 21, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc.. (Kelln, H)
August 21, 2020 Filing 115 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice re #113 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
August 21, 2020 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM in Support of #113 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
August 21, 2020 Filing 113 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
August 21, 2020 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Support of #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Connor, Thomas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Connor, Thomas)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #109 Motion to Withdraw. The Motion to Remand to State Court DE #60 is ordered WITHDRAWN. Approved by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 7/23/20. Text entry order. (nal)
July 22, 2020 Filing 109 First MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Desheena Adams. (Mendoza, Roberto (Alex))
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE on or before 7/22/2020, a supplement to the Motion to Remand discussing how, if at all, the Seventh Circuit decision in Baker affects Plaintiffs' position in the Motion to Remand DE #60 . Defendants will have 14 days in which to file a response to the supplement, and Plaintiffs will have 7 days in which to file a reply. Alternatively, if Plaintiffs conclude that their position in the Motion to Remand is not supportable in light of Baker, Plaintiffs may file a motion to withdraw the Motion to Remand instead of a supplement. The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to reinstate the Motion to Remand DE #60 as pending on the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 7/8/2020. (bas)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte. On July 2, 2020, Defendants filed a Status Report #105 indicating that the appeal of a related case has been resolved and that the stay is no longer necessary. The report indicates that Plaintiffs' counsel did not respond to Defendants' counsel's requests to file a joint report as ordered. Nonetheless, because the appeal of the related case was the basis for staying this case, see November 15, 2019 Order [DE 92], the Court finds that the stay is no longer necessary. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that the STAY IS LIFTED in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/7/20. (ksp)
July 2, 2020 Filing 106 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC re #73 Response to Motion,,,,, #74 Response to Motion (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reiter PHV, Diana)
July 2, 2020 Filing 105 STATUS REPORT (DEFENDANTS') by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reiter PHV, Diana)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Motion for Leave to Withdraw George J. Tzanetopoulos as Additional Counsel for Defendants DE #102 and Motion for Leave to Withdraw Thomas E. Hogan asAdditional Counsel for Defendants DE #103 and ORDERS that the appearances of Attorney George J. Tzanetopoulos and Thomas E. Hogan on behalf of Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammond Lead Products LLC, and Hammond Group, Inc. are hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/15/20. (nal)
June 12, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Hogan PHV, Thomas)
June 12, 2020 Filing 102 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
June 2, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta K Gumbiner on behalf of Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC (Gumbiner, Krysta)
June 2, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Connor on behalf of Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC (Connor, Thomas)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES the relief requested in the Consent Orders to Substitute Attorney #96 and #97 , with leave to re-file in compliance with applicable rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/1/2020. (shk)
June 1, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline R Sheridan on behalf of Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC (Sheridan, Jacqueline)
May 29, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Krysta K. Gumbiner for Thomas E. Hogan by Defendants Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Connor, Thomas)
May 29, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Thomas M. Connor for George James Tzanetopoulos by Defendants Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Connor, Thomas)
February 4, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Notice of Firm Name Change and E-Mail Contact Change (Harrell, Julian)
February 4, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information and Firm Name Change (Toner, Kevin)
February 3, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information and Firm Name Change by (Kelln, H)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER TO STAY ACTION PENDING APPEAL: It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties' #91 Joint Stipulation Regarding Stay of Proceedings is ACCEPTED; IT IS ORDERED that this action is STAYED, pending outcome of the appeal now pending in the Seventh Circuit; and ORDERED that the Parties shall file a joint status report in this action advising the Court of the ruling within 14 days of any such ruling. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 11/15/2019. (jss)
November 14, 2019 Filing 91 JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Stay of Proceedings by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Milburn PHV, Nancy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 90 STATUS REPORT (AMENDED) by Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., Mining Remedial Recovery Company, Mueller Industries, Inc., U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc.. (Kelln, H)
November 7, 2019 Filing 89 STATUS REPORT by Mining Remedial Recovery Company, Mueller Industries, Inc., Tesoro Corporation, The Chemours Company. (Kelln, H)
November 5, 2019 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company identifying Corporate Parent Corteva, Inc. for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company.. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
November 1, 2019 Filing 87 STATUS REPORT by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
October 3, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Stay Execution of any Remand Order this Court May Issue by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
September 16, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Kelln, H)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: This cause of action is related to several ongoing, earlier-filed causes (2:16cv525; 2:17cv193; 2:17cv429). Pursuant to N.D. Ind. Local Rule 40-1(d)(1), this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Joseph Van Bokkelen. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge James T Moody on 9/5/19. (tlr)
May 22, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
April 22, 2019 CASE DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to defendant Tesoro Corporation, only. (efc)
April 19, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Mendoza, Roberto (Alex))
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #80 Defendant's Fourth Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Tesoro Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 4/30/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/5/2019. No pdf attached.(sa)
April 4, 2019 Filing 80 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Tesoro Corporation. (Carroll, Martin)
March 14, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Tesoro Corporation answer due 4/5/2019. (mlc)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Defendant's Third Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Tesoro Corporation to answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint by 4/5/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/13/2019. No pdf attached. (sa)
March 11, 2019 Filing 78 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant's Third Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Tesoro Corporation. (Carroll, Martin)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 Defendant's Second Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Tesoro Corporation to answer or otherwise respond by 3/11/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/19/2019. No pdf attached.(sa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 76 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Second Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Tesoro Corporation. (Carroll, Martin)
January 11, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin B Carroll on behalf of Tesoro Corporation (Carroll, Martin)
January 9, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE to Motion re #60 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Highlighted Complaint)(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
January 9, 2019 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re #60 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of K. Austin Kerr, Ph.D., #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53, #56 Exhibit 54)(Milburn PHV, Nancy)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Defendant's Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Tesoro Corporation's response to be filed by 2/19/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/4/2019. No pdf attached.(sa)
January 3, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #59 Amended Complaint,, Agreed by Defendant Tesoro Corporation. (Brenneman, Steven)
December 28, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L Brenneman on behalf of Tesoro Corporation (Brenneman, Steven)
December 21, 2018 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (jss)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #67 , and ORDERS that the deadline for all Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to 30 days after the ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand at #60 . The Court VACATES the 2/24/2019 preliminary pretrial conference and discovery deadline previously set at #56 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/21/2018. (jss)
December 19, 2018 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Desheena Adams. Tesoro Corporation served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Mendoza, Roberto (Alex))
December 18, 2018 Filing 67 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #59 Amended Complaint,, #56 Order,, Set Hearings, by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Mining Remedial Recovery Company, Mueller Industries, Inc., The Chemours Company, U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc.. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Unopposed Motion of Certain Defendants for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, Atlantic Richfield Company, and BP West Coast Products LLC to respond by 1/9/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/17/2018. No pdf attached.(sa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #60 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
December 13, 2018 Filing 64 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tesoro Corporation. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
December 12, 2018 Filing 63 Proposed Summons filed by Desheena Adams. (Mendoza, Roberto (Alex))
December 11, 2018 Filing 62 Proposed Summons filed by Desheena Adams. (Mendoza, Roberto (Alex))Summons REFILED #63 and issued. Modified on 12/13/2018 (kjp).
December 6, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company of Related Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Holiday Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Barbee Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Baker Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Alvarez Complaint)(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Desheena Adams, Jose Blas Cruz Roque, Roberto Cabello, Jr., Mark Cole, Rhonda Collier, Arcelia Cruz, Leticia M De Luna, Donetta Dillon, Liduvina Espinosa, Angela Espinoza, Maribel Gamez, Michelle Garcia, Stephanie Griffin, Angelina Guteirrez De Cruz, Ronnita Hall, Kendra Mabry, Valerie Mallette, Africa McKinney, Vanessa McKinzey, Willie Moore, Minerva Ramirez, Angelene Rivera, Dennis Ruffins, Deshun Sanders, Angela Thornton, Maxine Tucker, Breanna Washington, Lasharday White. (Mendoza, Roberto (Alex)) Modified on 7/8/2020 to show document as pending (bas).
December 5, 2018 Filing 59 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against All Defendants, filed by Jose Blas Cruz Roque, Lasharday White, Leticia M De Luna, Valerie Mallette, Vanessa McKinzey, Roberto Cabello, Jr., Desheena Adams, Willie Moore, Africa McKinney, Breanna Washington, Maxine Tucker, Angelene Rivera, Ronnita Hall, Angela Thornton, Angela Espinoza, Maribel Gamez, Dennis Ruffins, Stephanie Griffin, Deshun Sanders, Angelina Guteirrez De Cruz, Mark Cole, Liduvina Espinosa, Michelle Garcia, Kendra Mabry, Donetta Dillon, Rhonda Collier, Minerva Ramirez, Arcelia Cruz.(Mendoza, Roberto (Alex))
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: The Court record is unclear as to the status of service of the State Court Complaint on Defendants Tesoro Corporation and BP Amoco Service. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file return/proof of service of the State Court Complaint on Defendants Tesoro Corporation and BP Amoco Service on or before 12/19/2018. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/5/2018. (smb)
December 5, 2018 Filing 57 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (smb)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2019 11:15 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 2/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/5/2018. (smb)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc. answer due 1/9/2019; Atlantic Richfield Company answer due 1/9/2019; BP West Coast Products LLC answer due 1/9/2019; E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company answer due 1/9/2019; Halox, LLC answer due 1/9/2019; Halstab, LLC answer due 1/9/2019; Hammond Group, Inc. answer due 1/9/2019; Hammond Lead Products, LLC answer due 1/9/2019; Mining Remedial Recovery Company answer due 1/9/2019; Mueller Industries, Inc. answer due 1/9/2019; The Chemours Company answer due 1/9/2019; U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc. answer due 1/9/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/26/2018. No pdf attached. (sa)
November 21, 2018 Filing 54 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Mining Remedial Recovery Company, Mueller Industries, Inc., Tesoro Corporation, The Chemours Company, U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc.. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/20/2018. (smb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 53 STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED. State Court Case No. 45D05-1809-ct-527. This record is maintained on paper in the court's files and is not available in electronic format. (rmf)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jesse M Feitel PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and for BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/19/2018. (mtr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 50 Application for Attorney Jesse M. Feitel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3735951(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #45 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Honor R Costello PHV for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/14/2018. (mtr)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #44 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tracy A Roman PHV for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/14/2018. (mtr)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #43 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathleen Taylor Sooy PHV for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/14/2018. (mtr)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Defendants Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Halstab, LLC, and Halox, LLC Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Deadline for Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Halstab, LLC, and Halox, LLC to respond extended to 12/10/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/13/2018. No pdf attached.(sa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 45 Application for Attorney Honor Rose Costello to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3731247(Costello PHV, Honor)
November 13, 2018 Filing 44 Application for Attorney Tracy A. Roman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3731243(Roman PHV, Tracy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 43 Application for Attorney Kathleen Taylor Sooy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company and The Chemours Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3731234(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
November 8, 2018 Filing 42 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Hammond Group, Inc.. (Abrahamson, Harold)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Motion to Remand. Deadline to file Motion to Remand extended to 12/5/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/7/2018. No pdf attached. (sa)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc. answer due 12/10/2018; Mining Remedial Recovery Company answer due 12/10/2018; Mueller Industries, Inc. answer due 12/10/2018; U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc. answer due 12/10/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/7/2018. No pdf attached. (sa)
November 5, 2018 Filing 39 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Desheena Adams, Jose Blas Cruz Roque, Roberto Cabello, Jr., Mark Cole, Rhonda Collier, Arcelia Cruz, Leticia M De Luna, Donetta Dillon, Liduvina Espinosa, Angela Espinoza, Maribel Gamez, Michelle Garcia, Stephanie Griffin, Angelina Guteirrez De Cruz, Ronnita Hall, Kendra Mabry, Valerie Mallette, Africa McKinney, Vanessa McKinzey, Willie Moore, Minerva Ramirez, Angelene Rivera, Dennis Ruffins, Deshun Sanders, Angela Thornton, Maxine Tucker, Breanna Washington, Lasharday White. (Mendoza, Roberto (Alex))
November 5, 2018 Filing 38 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., Mining Remedial Recovery Company, Mueller Industries, Inc., U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelln, H)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Atlantic Richfield Company answer due 12/10/2018; BP West Coast Products LLC answer due 12/10/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/2/2018. No pdf attached.(sa)
November 1, 2018 Filing 36 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Second Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company answer due 12/10/2018; The Chemours Company answer due 12/10/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/1/2018. No pdf attached.(sa)
October 31, 2018 Filing 34 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Cox, Dina)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Halox, LLC answer due 11/9/2018; Halstab, LLC answer due 11/9/2018; Hammond Group, Inc. answer due 11/9/2018; Hammond Lead Products, LLC answer due 11/9/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/30/2018. No pdf attached.(sa)
October 29, 2018 Filing 32 STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED (docket sheet). State Court Case No. 45D05-1809-CT-000527. (nal)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Defendants U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery Inc., Mining Remedial Recovery Company, Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., and Mueller Industries, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Response of those Defendants to be filed by 11/9/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/29/2018. No pdf attached.(sa)
October 29, 2018 Filing 30 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/19/2018. (smb)
October 26, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., Mining Remedial Recovery Company, Mueller Industries, Inc., U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc.. (Harrell, Julian)
October 25, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Harrell on behalf of Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., Mining Remedial Recovery Company, Mueller Industries, Inc., U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc. (Harrell, Julian)
October 25, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M Toner on behalf of Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., Mining Remedial Recovery Company, Mueller Industries, Inc., U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc. (Toner, Kevin)
October 25, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by H Max Kelln on behalf of Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc., Mining Remedial Recovery Company, Mueller Industries, Inc., U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc. (Kelln, H)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #18 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nancy G Milburn PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/19/2018. (mtr)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #17 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Diana E Reiter PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/19/18. (mtr)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean O Morris PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/19/2018. (mtr)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas E Hogan PHV for Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., and Hammond Lead Products, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/19/2018. (mtr)
October 19, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by George James Tzanetopoulos PHV on behalf of Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC (Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney George James Tzanetopoulos PHV for Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., and Hammond Lead Products, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/18/2018. (mtr)
October 18, 2018 Filing 19 Application for Attorney Sean O. Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3709776(Morris PHV, Sean)
October 18, 2018 Filing 18 Application for Attorney Nancy G. Milburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3709772(Milburn PHV, Nancy)
October 18, 2018 Filing 17 Application for Attorney Diana E. Reiter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3709723(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 Application for Attorney Thomas E Hogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Hammond Group, Inc.; Hammond Lead Products, LLC; Halstab, LLC; Halox, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3709149(Hogan PHV, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #1 DC Certificate of Good Standing) (mtr).
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 Application for Attorney George James Tzanetopoulos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Hammond Group, Inc.; Hammond Lead Products, LLC; Halstab, LLC; Halox, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3709086(Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Abrahamson, Harold)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer BP West Coast Products LLC answer due 11/9/2018; Atlantic Richfield Company answer due 11/9/2018; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company answer due 11/9/2018; The Chemours Company answer due 11/9/2018. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/10/2018. (smb)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hammond Group, Inc. for Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC.. (Abrahamson, Harold)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Abrahamson on behalf of Hammond Group, Inc.; Hammond Lead Products, LLC; Halstab, LLC; and Halox, LLC. (Abrahamson, Harold) Modified on 10/11/2018 (mtr).
October 8, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 State Court Complaint,,, by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Cox, Dina)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company identifying Corporate Parent DowDuPont, Inc. for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company.. (Cox, Dina)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Chemours Company. (Cox, Dina)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company re #1 Notice of Removal, in Support of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service on DuPont, #3 Exhibit C - Service on Chemours, #4 Exhibit D - Yalvigi Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Record)(Cox, Dina)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dina M Cox on behalf of E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company (Cox, Dina)
October 5, 2018 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE; MOTION PENDING) (ksp)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BP West Coast Products LLC. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BP West Coast Products LLC identifying Corporate Parent BP America Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY; Corporate Parent BP Products North America Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP West Coast Products LLC.. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A DeLaney on behalf of ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BP West Coast Products LLC (DeLaney, Kathleen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3697961.) from LAKE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT 5, Cause No. 45D05-1809-CT-00527, filed by BP West Coast Products LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - War Supply Contracts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Civil Cover Sheet)(DeLaney, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v Atlantic Richfield Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HALSTAB, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E Hogan PHV
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMMOND LEAD PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E Hogan PHV
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Corporation
Represented By: Martin B Carroll
Represented By: Steven L Brenneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arava Natural Resources Company, Inc.
Represented By: Julian Harrell
Represented By: Kevin M Toner
Represented By: H Max Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mueller Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Julian Harrell
Represented By: Kevin M Toner
Represented By: H Max Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. SMELTER AND LEAD REFINERY, INC. d/b/a U.S.S. Lead Refinery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Dina M Cox
Represented By: Honor R Costello PHV
Represented By: Tracy A Roman PHV
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMOCO PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mining Remedial Recovery Company
Represented By: Julian Harrell
Represented By: Kevin M Toner
Represented By: H Max Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammond Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E Hogan PHV
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: Dina M Cox
Represented By: Honor R Costello PHV
Represented By: Tracy A Roman PHV
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY
Represented By: Kathleen A DeLaney
Represented By: Diana E Reiter PHV
Represented By: Sean O Morris PHV
Represented By: Jesse M Feitel PHV
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Represented By: Kathleen A DeLaney
Represented By: Diana E Reiter PHV
Represented By: Sean O Morris PHV
Represented By: Jesse M Feitel PHV
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HALOX, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E Hogan PHV
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc.
Represented By: Julian Harrell
Represented By: Kevin M Toner
Represented By: H Max Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Smelter and Lead Refinery, Inc. doing business as U.S.S. Lead Refinery, Inc.
Represented By: Julian Harrell
Represented By: Kevin M Toner
Represented By: H Max Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE GRIFFIN
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE GARCIA, individually, and as mother and next friend of E.C., G.G., M.G., A.G.2, and J.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE MOORE
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS RUFFINS, individually, and as father and next friend of I.W. and L.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIBEL GAMEZ, individually, and as mother and next friend of A.G.1 AND A.G.H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIDUVINA ESPINOSA
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE MALLETTE
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFRICA MCKINNEY, individually, and as mother and next friend of J.A., J.M., and D.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK COLE
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELENE RIVERA, individually, and as mother and next friend of D.R.2, A.R.1, and A.R.2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESHAUN SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINERVA RAMIREZ, individually, and as mother and next friend of D.R.1, C.R., and M.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXINE TUCKER, individually, and as mother and next friend of A.E.2, O.G.1, O.G.2, and L.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA ESPINOZA, individually, and as mother and next friend of A.E.1, R.E., N.C., A.C., and K.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE BLAS CRUZ ROQUE, individually and as father and next friend of L.C.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHONDA COLLIER, individually, and as mother and next friend of J.J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESHEENA ADAMS, individually, and as mother and next friend of C.B.1, C.B. 2, C.H., and C.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNITA HALL
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LETICIA M. DE LUNA, individually, and as mother and next friend of S.C., I.L., I.O., C.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNETTA DILLON, individually, and as mother and next friend of, A.D. 1, A.D. 2, A.J., D.S. 1, D.S. 2, D.S. 3, D.S.4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELINA GUTEIRREZ DE CRUZ
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA MCKINZEY, individually, and as mother and next friend of A.W. and D.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA THORNTON, individually, and as mother and next friend of J.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BREANNA WASHINGTON, individually, and as mother and next friend of C.W. and K.W.2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Cabello, Jr.
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARCELLA CRUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENDRA MABRY, individually, and as mother and next friend of K.W.1, M.C.1, M.C.2, J.W.1, and J.W.2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Ramirez
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Collier
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Blas Cruz Roque
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia M De Luna
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desheena Adams
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Africa McKinney
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshun Sanders
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Mabry
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Garcia
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lasharday White
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arcelia Cruz
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelene Rivera
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Espinoza
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Thornton
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa McKinzey
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donetta Dillon
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ruffins
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Gamez
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna Washington
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Tucker
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?