Rose v. CNH Industrial America LLC et al

Plaintiff: Cherie Rose
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC and Todd Mader
Case Number: 2:2018cv00458
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court REMINDS the parties that the case management deadlines will be set by the Court at the preliminary pretrial conference set for February 28, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/23/19. (ksp)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendants CNH Industrial America LLC, Todd Mader. (Johnston, Haley)
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (smb)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2019 11:30 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 2/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/28/2018. (smb)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/28/2018. (smb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by CNH Industrial America LLC, Todd Mader of Agreed Initial Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs Discovery Requests (Johnston, Haley)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 RECEIPT of State Court Docket Sheet. (rmf)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Montgomery on behalf of Cherie Rose (Montgomery, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas C Pappas on behalf of All Defendants (Pappas, Nicholas)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Haley Johnston's Declaration of Service) by CNH Industrial America LLC, Todd Mader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit State Court Record: Complaint; Summons to CNH Industrial America LLC; Summons to Todd Mader; Return of Service Green Card to CNH Industrial America LLC; Return of Service Green Card to Todd Mader; CCS Entry Dated 11/21/18; Appearance of Haley Johnston and Nicholas Pappas; Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Defendants' Jury Demand; CCS Entry, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, Haley)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CNH Industrial America LLC identifying Corporate Parent CNH Industrial NV, Other Affiliate Case New Holland Industrial Inc., Other Affiliate CNH Industrial US Holdings Inc for CNH Industrial America LLC.. (Johnston, Haley)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley A Johnston on behalf of CNH Industrial America LLC, Todd Mader (Johnston, Haley)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3752763.) from Lake County Superior Court 4, Cause No. 45D04-1811-CT-00742, filed by Todd Mader, CNH Industrial America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record: Complaint; Summons to CNH Industrial America LLC; Summons to Todd Mader; Return of Service Green Card to CNH Industrial America LLC; Return of Service to Todd Mader; CCS Entry dated 11/21/18; Appearance of Haley Johnston and Nicholas Pappas; Defendants' Answer to Complaint; Defendants' Jury Demand; CCS Entry, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, Haley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. CNH Industrial America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Rose
Represented By: Robert A Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Represented By: Haley A Johnston
Represented By: Nicholas C Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Mader
Represented By: Haley A Johnston
Represented By: Nicholas C Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?