Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Weldon et al

Plaintiff: Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Douglas Lloyd Weldon, H.C., L.R. and Doug Weldon
Case Number: 2:2019cv00068
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Smith, Charles)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff to file a status report by 4/5/2019, to advise status on service of process as to Defendant L.R., a minor. Alternatively, Plaintiff may electronically file the executed return of summons. Text entry order. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/22/2019. cc: Doug Weldon (tc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Arman Garo Sarkisian on behalf of H.C. (Sarkisian, Arman)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by H.C..(Sarkisian, Arman)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Smith, Charles)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/8/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (tc) Modified on 3/11/2019 (tc).
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Doug Weldon. (rmf)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REISSUED as to H.C., L.R., Doug Weldon. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M Kraft on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kraft, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to H.C., L.R., Doug Weldon. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
February 20, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (New Case) (sct)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S Smith on behalf of Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Smith, Charles)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3812793.), filed by Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Weldon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Lloyd Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.C.
Represented By: Arman Garo Sarkisian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles S Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey M Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?