United States of America v. Bartlett's and BS, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gary Sanders, Bartlett's and BS, Inc. and Bartlett's and BS, Inc. doing business as Bartlett's Gourmet Grill and Tavern
Case Number: 2:2019cv00104
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Gary Sanders on 5/22/2019, filed by United States of America. (Foster, Angela)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Bartlett's and BS Inc. on 4/26/2019, filed by United States of America. (Foster, Angela)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bartlett's and BS, Inc., Gary Sanders. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
March 19, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (New Case) (sct)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bartlett's and BS, Inc., Gary Sanders, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Summons for Bartlett's, #3 Supplement Civil Summons for Sanders)(Foster, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bartlett's and BS, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartlett's and BS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartlett's and BS, Inc. doing business as Bartlett's Gourmet Grill and Tavern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Angela R Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?