Trustees of the Bricklayers Union Local No 6 of Indiana Pension Fund et al v. Lakewood Design, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers Union Local No 6 of Indiana Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers Union Local No 6 of Indiana Pension Fund, Local No 6 Bricklayers Union Indiana Pension Fund Trustees of the and Local No 6 Bricklayers Union of Indiana Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of
Defendant: Lakewood Design, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00105
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Local No 6 Bricklayers Union Indiana Pension Fund Trustees of the, Local No 6 Bricklayers Union of Indiana Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letters to Defendant)(Stoehr, Paul)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Compel Audit and ORDERS Defendant Lakewood Design, Inc. to produce the requested documents to Plaintiffs and allow Plaintiffs' auditors to come upon the property of Defendant for the purposes of the audit on or before 7/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 6/3/2019. (mrm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Audit by Plaintiffs Local No 6 Bricklayers Union of Indiana Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of, Local No 6 Bricklayers Union of Indiana Pension Fund Trustees of. (Stoehr, Paul)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Lakewood Design, Inc.* regarding #5 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Local No 6 Bricklayers Union of Indiana Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of, Local No 6 Bricklayers Union of Indiana Pension Fund Trustees of (nae)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Lakewood Design, Inc. by Plaintiffs Local No 6 Bricklayers Union of Indiana Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of, Local No 6 Bricklayers Union of Indiana Pension Fund Trustees of. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default)(Stoehr, Paul)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local No 6 Bricklayers Union of Indiana Pension Fund Trustees of, Local No 6 Bricklayers Union of Indiana Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of. Lakewood Design, Inc. served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (Stoehr, Paul)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lakewood Design, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
March 20, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (New Case) (sct)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E Stoehr on behalf of Trustees of the Bricklayers Union Local No 6 of Indiana Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers Union Local No 6 of Indiana Welfare Fund (Stoehr, Paul)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lakewood Design, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3840380.), filed by Trustees of the Bricklayers Union Local No 6 of Indiana Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers Union Local No 6 of Indiana Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed MOA, #2 Exhibit B - 2001 CBA Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - 2004 CBA Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - 2007 CBA Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E - 2010 CBA Excerpts, #6 Exhibit F - 2012 CBA Excerpts, #7 Exhibit G - 2012 CBA Excerpts, #8 Exhibit H - Pension Fund Trust Excerpts, #9 Exhibit I - Welfare Fund Trust Excerpts, #10 Exhibit J - Collection Policy, #11 Exhibit K - Payroll Audit Policy, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons)(Stoehr, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Bricklayers Union Local No 6 of Indiana Pension Fund et al v. Lakewood Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers Union Local No 6 of Indiana Welfare Fund
Represented By: Paul E Stoehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers Union Local No 6 of Indiana Pension Fund
Represented By: Paul E Stoehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 6 Bricklayers Union Indiana Pension Fund Trustees of the
Represented By: Paul E Stoehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 6 Bricklayers Union of Indiana Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of
Represented By: Paul E Stoehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?