United States of America v. $139,000.00 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $139,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Qihua Chen
Case Number: 2:2019cv00106
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2 from Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar and Senior Judge James T Moody to Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. (kjp)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/5/2019. (tc)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Status/Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2019 09:30 AM (Central Time) in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Court to initiate the call. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 6/13/2019. Text entry order. (tc)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 6/12/2019. (tc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER to Verified Complaint by Qihua Chen. (Nader PHV, Troy)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Court STRIKES, with leave to refile, #7 Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Northern District of Indiana Local Rule 10-1(a) mandates that responsive pleadings must restate verbatim the paragraphs from the pleading they respond to and, immediately following each restated paragraph, state the response to that paragraph. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 5/8/2019. Text entry order. (tc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 STRICKEN RE 8 ORDER: Answer And Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Qihua Chen.(Nader PHV, Troy) Modified on 5/8/2019 (tc).
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM Verified by Qihua Chen. (Nader PHV, Troy)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Troy Nader PHV for Qihua Chen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/17/2019. (mtr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Application for Attorney Troy Nader to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Qihua Chen. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3865810(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #2 Warrant Issued (Attachments: #1 DIRECT NOTICE OF JUDICIAL FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS)(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM issued. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (sct)
March 21, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (New Case) (sct)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN REM against $139,000.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons /Warrant for Arrest in Rem)(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $139,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $139,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Orest S Szewciw - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Qihua Chen
Represented By: Troy Nader PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?