No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of et al v. McAllister General Contractors Inc
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Teamsters Union No 142 Pension Fund, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of and Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the
Defendant: McAllister General Contractors Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00107
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Local No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the. (Massa, Teresa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *McAllister General Contractors Inc doing business as McAllister Inc* regarding #7 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default, filed by No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the (jss)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Local No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the as to McAllister General Contractors Inc d/b/a McAllister Inc. (Massa, Teresa)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the. McAllister General Contractors Inc served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Massa, Teresa)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to McAllister General Contractors Inc. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Local No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the. (Massa, Teresa)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to McAllister General Contractors Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
March 21, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (sct)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa A Massa on behalf of Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Teamsters Union No 142 Pension Fund (Massa, Teresa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McAllister General Contractors Inc( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3841115.), filed by Trustees of the Teamsters Union No 142 Pension Fund, Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Massa, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of et al v. McAllister General Contractors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Teresa A Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund
Represented By: Teresa A Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Teamsters Union No 142 Pension Fund
Represented By: Teresa A Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the
Represented By: Teresa A Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of
Represented By: Teresa A Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the
Represented By: Teresa A Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAllister General Contractors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?