Norman et al v. Marinosci Law Group P C et al
Plaintiff: Phillip A Norman, Phillip A. Norman, P.C. Attorneys f/k/a Phillip A. Norman, Attorney, Professional Corporation, Desert Streams, LLC, Phillip A Norman PC and Phillip A Norman, Attorney, Professional Corporation
Defendant: Gary Marinosci and Marinosci Law Group, P.C.
Not Classified By Court: Gerald Bishop
Case Number: 2:2019cv00111
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Desert Streams, LLC, Phillip A Norman of Agreement on Mediator (Cerven, David)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The appearance of Attorney David A. Buls on behalf of Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants Phillip A.Norman PC, Phillip A. Norman, and Desert Streams, LLC is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/26/19. (kjp)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held 6/20/2019 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla appeared by atty David Cerven in person, David Buls teleph.Dft appeared by atty Steven A. Johnson teleph. Attorney Buls motion to withdraw will be granted once Attorney Cerven files his appearance for all Counterdefendants. All dates/ddl in Joint Report #16 through close of discovery are approved and adopted herein. Any motion for leave to amend pleadings to be filed by 8/15/2019. Fact Discovery deadline is 2/1/2020. Expert Discovery deadline is 5/1/2020. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 2/15/2020. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 3/15/2020. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 7/15/2019. Mediator Selection Deadline is 8/15/2019. Mediation to be completed and report filed by 2/1/2020. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 7/11/2019. All other dates/ddl to be set by the presiding trial judge upon conclusion of discovery. The summary judgment ddl per FRCP 56 shall not apply. All other dates/ddl to be set by the presiding trial judge upon conclusion of discovery.(#FTR.) (smb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David Cerven on behalf of Desert Streams, LLC, Phillip A Norman (Cerven, David)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER/SET HEARING re #18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Desert Streams, LLC, Phillip A Norman PC, Phillip A Norman. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2019 11:45 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Counsel may request to participate telephonically with advance notice to the Court's case manager sue_brown@innd.uscourts.gov. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/18/2019. (smb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs Desert Streams, LLC, Phillip A Norman, Phillip A Norman PC. (Buls, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David Cerven on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cerven, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Buls, David)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Phillip A Norman.(Buls, David)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 Defendants, Marinosci Law Group, P.C. and Gary Marinosci's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Desert Streams, LLC, Phillip A Norman, Phillip A Norman PC by Marinosci Law Group, P.C., Gary Marinosci.(Johnson, Steven)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2019 11:45 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/7/2019. (smb)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/7/2019. (smb)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Gary Marinosci, Marinosci Law Group, P.C. ; answer due by May 16, 2019. (Johnson, Steven)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING the relief requested in #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, with leave to re-file a renewed notice or motion that complies with Local Rule 6-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/16/19. (ksp)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Notice of Appearance by Defendants Gary Marinosci, Marinosci Law Group, P.C.. (Johnson, Steven)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Steven)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gary Marinosci, Marinosci Law Group, P.C.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
March 22, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (sct)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Desert Streams, LLC, Phillip A Norman, Phillip A. Norman, P.C. Attorneys f/k/a Phillip A. Norman, Attorney, Professional Corporation. (Buls, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Desert Streams, LLC, Phillip A Norman, Phillip A. Norman, P.C. Attorneys f/k/a Phillip A. Norman, Attorney, Professional Corporation. (Buls, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David A Buls on behalf of Desert Streams, LLC, Phillip A Norman, Phillip A. Norman, P.C. Attorneys f/k/a Phillip A. Norman, Attorney, Professional Corporation (Buls, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gary Marinosci, Marinosci Law Group, P.C.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3842748.), filed by Phillip A. Norman, P.C. Attorneys f/k/a Phillip A. Norman, Attorney, Professional Corporation, Desert Streams, LLC, Phillip A Norman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Buls, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman et al v. Marinosci Law Group P C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Marinosci
Represented By: Christopher W Johnson
Represented By: Steven A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinosci Law Group, P.C.
Represented By: Christopher W Johnson
Represented By: Steven A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip A Norman
Represented By: David A Buls
Represented By: David Cerven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip A. Norman, P.C. Attorneys f/k/a Phillip A. Norman, Attorney, Professional Corporation
Represented By: David A Buls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Streams, LLC
Represented By: David A Buls
Represented By: David Cerven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip A Norman PC
Represented By: David A Buls
Represented By: David Cerven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip A Norman, Attorney, Professional Corporation
Represented By: David A Buls
Represented By: David Cerven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gerald Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?