Thomas v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Richard Thomas
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc., Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC and Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00113
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #7 Affidavit of Service of Summons, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. answer due 4/18/2019. (nae)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Zydus Pharmaceuticals(USA) Inc. on 3/28/2019, filed by Richard Thomas. (Anderson, Matthew) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct served date to 3/28/19 per USPS (nae).
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: re #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate these three defendants as parties to this action. The only remaining defendant is Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA). Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 5/2/2019. (jss)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Thomas (Anderson, Matthew)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING #3 Stipulation to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 4/23/19. (ksp)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Dismiss Certain Defendants Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Richard Thomas. (Anderson, Matthew)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
March 25, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (New Case) (sct)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Jonson( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3843579.), filed by Richard Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Anderson, Matthew) Modified on 3/25/2019 to correct dft (sct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Thomas
Represented By: Matthew J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?