United States of America v. Lattimore et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Lue Ida Lattimore and United States Steel & Carnegie Pension Fund
Case Number: 2:2019cv00130
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Lue Ida Lattimore by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bradley A. Sarnell, #2 Affidavit of Erica Highbaugh, #3 Supplement Proposed Default Judgment)(Sarnell, Bradley)
June 3, 2019 ***Hearing terminated per #14 Order. (jat)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Vacate. The Court VACATES the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference, currently scheduled for 06/21/2019, as is the requirement for the parties to file a proposed discovery plan, to be reset at a later date if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 06/03/2019. (jat)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Vacate Rule 16 Hearing by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sarnell, Bradley)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Lue Ida Lattimore* regarding #9 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by United States of America (ksp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 6/10/2019. (tc)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2019 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/20/2019. (tc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Defendant Lue Ida Lattimore by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default)(Sarnell, Bradley)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Lue Ida Lattimore served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Sarnell, Bradley)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #4 Stipulation. United States Steel & Carnegie Pension Fund shall not be required to file an answer or otherwise to participate actively in this action, and shall be excused from any future hearings and conferences unless specifically required to attend by the court. United States Steel & Carnegie Pension Fund shall remain a party to this action and subject to discovery obligations, including the obligation to respond to any properly served discovery requests that are propounded by the United States or by any other parties to this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/8/19. (ksp)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel F Reynolds, Jr on behalf of United States Steel & Carnegie Pension Fund (Reynolds, Samuel)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/7/2019. (tc)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION and Joint Request for an Order Regarding Defendant United States Steel & Carnegie Pension Fund's Involvement in the Case by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sarnell, Bradley)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 *** FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY FILED AMENDED NOTICE AT DE#6 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel F Reynolds, Jr on behalf of United States Steel & Carnegie Pension Fund (Reynolds, Samuel) Modified on 5/7/2019 (mtr).
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lue Ida Lattimore, United States Steel & Carnegie Pension Fund. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
April 5, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (New Case) (sct)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lue Ida Lattimore, United States Steel & Carnegie Pension Fund, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: October 23, 2015 Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons for Lue Ida Lattimore, #4 Proposed Summons for United States Steel & Carnegie Pension Fund)(Sarnell, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lattimore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lue Ida Lattimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel & Carnegie Pension Fund
Represented By: Samuel F Reynolds, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bradley A Sarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?