Ocasio v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Manuel Ocasio
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv00147
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (Copy mailed to pro se party). Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/12/2019. (smb)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/21/2019. (cc: pro se party)(smb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Rebuttal to Dismiss this Case filed by Manuel Ocasio re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. (nal)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service filed by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ault - AUSA, Wayne)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service by Defendant United States Postal Service. (Ault - AUSA, Wayne)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 State Court Complaint. United States Postal Service answer due 5/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/24/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(kjp)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 State Court Complaint by Defendant United States Postal Service. (Ault - AUSA, Wayne)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by United States Postal Service ; answer due by May 23, 2019. (Ault - AUSA, Wayne)
April 19, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D12-1903-SC-001502, filed by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ault - AUSA, Wayne)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service, filed by Manuel Ocasio.(mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocasio v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Ocasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Wayne T Ault - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?