Westfield Insurance Company v. Garred Transport, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Defendant: Garred Transport, Inc., Richard Hopkinson and Stefanie D. Woudema
Case Number: 2:2019cv00157
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Garred Transport, Inc.. (Tonner, Gregory)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J Tonner on behalf of Garred Transport, Inc. (Tonner, Gregory)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment and Affirmative Defenses by Stefanie D. Woudema.(Treasure, Justin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M Treasure on behalf of Stefanie D. Woudema (Treasure, Justin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Hopkinson. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Vitone, Linda)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Extension of Time re #4 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Garred Transport, Inc.. (Portelli, James) Modified on 6/11/2019 to reflect document is a notice (tc).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/23/2019. (tc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Garred Transport, Inc. served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Vitone, Linda)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James M Portelli on behalf of Garred Transport, Inc. (Portelli, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Garred Transport, Inc., Richard Hopkinson, Stefanie D. Woudema. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
May 3, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Garred Transport, Inc., Richard Hopkinson, Stefanie D. Woudema, filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - certified policy, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint)(Vitone, Linda)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westfield Insurance Company. (Vitone, Linda)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda L Vitone on behalf of Westfield Insurance Company (Vitone, Linda)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Garred Transport, Inc., Richard Hopkinson, Stefanie D. Woudema( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3881102.), filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Vitone, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfield Insurance Company v. Garred Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garred Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Tonner
Represented By: James M Portelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hopkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefanie D. Woudema
Represented By: Justin M Treasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda L Vitone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?