Robinson v. RMC McDonald Enterprises c/o Gina M. LiVolsi
Plaintiff: Christopher Robinson
Defendant: RMC McDonald Enterprises c/o Gina M. LiVolsi and RMC McDonald Enterprises
Case Number: 2:2019cv00161
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (smb)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2019 11:00 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/2/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(smb)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/2/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(smb)
June 26, 2019 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Waiver of Service deadline terminated. Waiver of Service returned executed by RMC McDonald Enterprises on 6/24/19. (tlr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RMC McDonald Enterprises. (Caruso, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Caruso on behalf of RMC McDonald Enterprises (Caruso, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RMC McDonald Enterprises. RMC McDonald Enterprises waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Caruso, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 *Refiled at DE #6 using correct event* WAIVER by RMC McDonald Enterprises . (Caruso, Anthony) Modified on 6/25/2019 to update docket text. (nal)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to RMC McDonald Enterprises, c/o Gina M. LiVolsi. (Copy mailed to defendant). Waiver of Service due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (nal)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DEFERS payment of the filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process at RMC McDonald Enterprises, c/o Gina M. LiVolsi, 1200 Shermer Rd., Suite 310, Northbrook, IL 60062. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 5/22/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher Robinson. (shk)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copy of summons form and 1 copy of USM-285 form against RMC McDonald Enterprises c/o Gina M. LiVolsi, filed by Christopher Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM 285)(shk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. RMC McDonald Enterprises c/o Gina M. LiVolsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMC McDonald Enterprises c/o Gina M. LiVolsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMC McDonald Enterprises
Represented By: Anthony J Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?