Lynch v. DeMotte State Bank et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Lynch
Defendant: DeMotte State Bank and Chicago Title Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00162
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF in Support of #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DeMotte State Bank. (Mosby, Whitney)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant DeMotte State Bank. (Mosby, Whitney)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Chicago Title Company, LLC. Chicago Title Company, LLC answer due 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/27/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(kjp)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply / Motion for Additional Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Chicago Title Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Theising, David)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney L Mosby on behalf of DeMotte State Bank (Mosby, Whitney)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Initial Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and ORDERS that Defendant Chicago Title Company, LLC has an extension until 06/27/2019 within which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 06/06/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jat)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Pro Se Complaint / Initial Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Chicago Title Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Theising, David)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Title Company, LLC. (Theising, David)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Theising on behalf of Chicago Title Company, LLC (Theising, David)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and ORDERS that Defendant Demotte State Bank has an extension until 06/27/2019 within which to respond Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 05/30/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jat)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Briefing Schedule by Defendant DeMotte State Bank. (Pendexter, Andrew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint by Defendant DeMotte State Bank. (Pendexter, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DeMotte State Bank. (Pendexter, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Miller Pendexter on behalf of DeMotte State Bank (Pendexter, Andrew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Expedited Consideration, or for a Temporary Restraining Order (unsigned) by Plaintiff Kathy Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Statement of Facts (unsigned), #3 Exhibits, #4 Proposed Order) (jat)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chicago Title Company, LLC, DeMotte State Bank. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 2 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms and with Jury Demand against Chicago Title Company, LLC, DeMotte State Bank (Filing fee $ 400.) Receipt #2018262, filed by Kathy Lynch. (rmf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. DeMotte State Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeMotte State Bank
Represented By: Andrew Miller Pendexter
Represented By: Whitney L Mosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Company, LLC
Represented By: David J Theising
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?