Plumbers & Pipefitters Welfare Fund et al v. BMG Mechanical Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Equality and Stabilization Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Pension Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Voluntary 401(k) Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund, The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local Union No. 172 of South Bend Indiana, Labor Management Promotional Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Welfare Fund, Industry Advancement Fund The, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Equality and Stabilization Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Pension Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Welfare Fund, Industry Advancement Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Voluntary 401(k) Fund, Local Union No 172 United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada of South Bend Indiana The and Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund
Defendant: BMG Mechanical Corp. and Brittany Gayheart
Case Number: 2:2019cv00164
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D Grabell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Grabell, Matthew)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/14/2019. cc: Gayheart (tc)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: BMG Mechanical Corp. shall have up to and including 6/10/2019, in which to retain counsel, as required by law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/13/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Labor Management Promotional Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund, Local Union No 172 United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada of South Bend Indiana The, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Pension Fund, Industry Advancement Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Equality and Stabilization Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Welfare Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Voluntary 401(k) Fund. Brittany Gayheart served on 5/11/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Krol, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Labor Management Promotional Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund, Local Union No 172 United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada of South Bend Indiana The, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Pension Fund, Industry Advancement Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Equality and Stabilization Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Welfare Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Voluntary 401(k) Fund. BMG Mechanical Corp. served on 5/11/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Krol, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BMG Mechanical Corp. and Brittany Gayheart. (NOTE: Document reflects incorrect case no. 1:19-cv-157)(bas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BMG Mechanical Corp., Brittany Gayheart. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued to Brittany Gayheart)(nae)
May 6, 2019 (NEW CASE) Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (nae)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Mallon on behalf of Industry Advancement Fund, Labor Management Promotional Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Equality and Stabilization Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Pension Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Voluntary 401(k) Fund, Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Welfare Fund, Local Union No 172 United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada of South Bend Indiana The (Mallon, Joseph)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 *** FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE DOCUMENT; DOCUMENT REFILED AT DE #4 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Mallon on behalf of Industry Advancement Fund The, Labor Management Promotional Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Equality and Stabilization Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Pension Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Voluntary 401(k) Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Welfare Fund, The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local Union No. 172 of South Bend Indiana (Mallon, Joseph) Modified on 5/6/2019 (ace). Modified on 5/7/2019 (ace).
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Krol on behalf of Industry Advancement Fund The, Labor Management Promotional Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Equality and Stabilization Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Pension Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Voluntary 401(k) Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Welfare Fund, The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local Union No. 172 of South Bend Indiana (Krol, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMG Mechanical Corp., Brittany Gayheart( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3882509.), filed by Labor Management Promotional Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund, The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local Union No. 172 of South Bend Indiana, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Pension Fund, Industry Advancement Fund The, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Equality and Stabilization Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Voluntary 401(k) Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subscription Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - CBA, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - BMG Mechanical Corp., #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Brittany Gayheart)(Krol, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plumbers & Pipefitters Welfare Fund et al v. BMG Mechanical Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMG Mechanical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Gayheart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Equality and Stabilization Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Pension Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Voluntary 401(k) Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local Union No. 172 of South Bend Indiana
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labor Management Promotional Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: Matthew D Grabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 172 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industry Advancement Fund The
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Equality and Stabilization Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: Matthew D Grabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Pension Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: Matthew D Grabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: Matthew D Grabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industry Advancement Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: Matthew D Grabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Voluntary 401(k) Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: Matthew D Grabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union No 172 United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada of South Bend Indiana The
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: Matthew D Grabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 172 Plumbers & Pipefitters Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: Matthew D Grabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?